This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2021 at 12:33:43 (UTC).

Lewis v. Boughman et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Lewis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Boughman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01395

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Lee Lewis

Canton, IL 61520

Defendants

Robert Stachniak

Mellissa Rivera

Sheila Batton

Jonathan Noble

. Awada

Brittany Miller

. Tracy

Lynette Boughman

. Osmundson

. Durbin

J Meaker

Sherry Benton

 

Court Documents

21 #5

part 5

21 #4

part 4

21 #3

part 3

21 #2

part 2

21 #1

Proposed Amended Complaint

#21

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

16 #2

part 3

#5

#3

#4

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

1 #3

Exhibits Part 3

1 #2

Exhibits Part 2

1 #1

Exhibits Part 1

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 1/8/2021. Plaintiff's motion for additional time to file an amended complaint is denied as moot #19 . Plaintiff has filed a timely motion for leave to amend #21 . (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Lewis. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 part 2, #3 part 3, #4 part 4, #5 part 5)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jerry Lee Lewis (AEM, ilcd) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Lewis. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (AEM, ilcd) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/21/2020. The Court dismissed Plaintiff's initial complaint on December 19, 2020, for failure to clearly state a claim upon which relief could be granted and as a violation of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 10. Plaintiff then filed an 80-page document seeking an attorney #16 . The motion was dismissed, and Plaintiff was again advised he must file an amended complaint in compliance with the December 9, 2020, Case Management Order. See December 14, 2020, Text Order. Plaintiff has now filed a 101-page motion with exhibits to provide more information about "the political warfare that I am in." #18 . This is not a proper motion. The Court cannot consider Plaintiff's current living conditions until he files a proper complaint with the Court. In addition, Plaintiff is again advised he must not file exhibits with the Court. The motion is therefore denied #18 . Plaintiff has also filed a motion requesting additional time to file his amended complaint due to limited access to legal materials #17 . The motion is granted #17 . Plaintiff must file his amended complaint on or before January 19, 2021. Plaintiff is admonished he MUST file his amended complaint by the new deadline and he MUST follow the directions provided in the Court's December 19, 2020, Case Management Order. Plaintiff's amended complaint must include a short and plain statement of his claims as explained in the Court's order and must not include exhibits. If the Plaintiff continues to ignore Court orders, his case will be dismissed.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Lewis. Responses due by 12/29/2020 (AEM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time for Merit Review by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Lewis. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (AEM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/14/2020. On December 9, 2020, the Court dismissed Plaintiff's initial complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and violation of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 10. See December 9, 2020, Merit Review Order. The Court pointed out the deficiencies in Plaintiff's filing and allowed him extra time to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff has now filed an 80-page document entitled Motion Seeking Expert Experience Legal Attorney #16 . Most of the document, though difficult to decipher, lists Plaintiff's various grievances with IDOC. Plaintiff is again admonished he MUST file an amended complaint which follows the specific directions provided by the Court in the December 9, 2020, Merit Review Order before the Court will consider whether to appoint counsel to assist Plaintiff. Therefore, the motion is denied #16 . Plaintiff is also advised in any future motion for appointment of counsel, Plaintiff must demonstrate he "made a reasonable attempt to obtain counsel or been effectively precluded from doing so." Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654 (7th Cir. 2007), citing Farmer v. Haas, 990 F.2d 319, 322 (7th Cir. 1993). Therefore, Plaintiff should provide a list of attorneys contacted or copies of letters sent or received. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Lewis. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4)(AEM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Remark: Complaint form attached pursuant to Merit Review Order (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER entered by James E. Shadid on 11/25/2020. Plaintiff has filed a handwritten Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #8 that is insufficient. #8 is denied. The Court will grant Plaintiff an extension until 12/15/2020 to file a completed Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months or pay the $400 filing fee in full. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to provide Plaintiff with another "IFP" form.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jerry Lee Lewis.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jerry Lee Lewis (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Exhibits by Jerry Lee Lewis. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Lewis. Responses due by 12/8/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Remark: IFP form attached pursuant to Text Order 11/13/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE filed by Jerry Lee Lewis. (AEM, ilcd) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 11/13/2020. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Lee Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibits Part 2, #3 Exhibits Part 3, #4 Exhibits Part 4)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Durbin is a litigant

Latest cases where Osmundson is a litigant

Latest cases where TRACY is a litigant