This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2021 at 10:18:24 (UTC).

Lewis v. Allen et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Lewis filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Allen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A. Jackson and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cleveland Lewis doing business as "Slice Beatz"

Defendants

Theory Entertainment, LLC doing business as 300 Entertainment

Trill Entertainment, LLC

Trill Productions, LLC

ABC Insurance Company

Jeremy Allen doing business as Mouse on Tha Track

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brad Elliot Harrigan

Attorney at Tolar Harrigan & Morris LLC

1055 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 208

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kenneth L Tolar

Attorney at Tolar Harrigan & Morris LLC

1055 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 208

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Request for Summons

1 #4

Request for Summons

1 #5

Request for Summons

1 #6

Request for Summons

#2

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/22/2021. (BLR) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Jeremy Allen, Theory Entertainment, LLC, Trill Entertainment, LLC, Trill Productions, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon 11-12-2021 on 11-12-2021 by Personal (Tolar, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service of subpoena(s) executed upon Trill Productions, LLC on 11-16-2021 by Personal (Tolar, Kenneth) Modified on 12/8/2021 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service of subpoena(s) executed upon Trill Productions, LLC on 11-16-2021 by Personal (Tolar, Kenneth) Modified on 12/8/2021 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon 11-12-2021 on 11-12-2021 by Personal (Tolar, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jeremy Allen, Theory Entertainment, LLC, Trill Entertainment, LLC, Trill Productions, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/22/2021. (BLR) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to the US Copyright Office. (NLT) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2353671.), filed by Cleveland Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Summons, #4 Request for Summons, #5 Request for Summons, #6 Request for Summons)(Harrigan, Brad) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad Elliot Harrigan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth L. Tolar