This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 07:05:49 (UTC).

Lewis et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Lewis filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00068

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Catherine Lewis

Robert Lewis

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enrique Elliot Adler

Attorney at Adler Law Group APLC

402 W. Broadway, Suite 860

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Joe G. Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-176) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (DLB) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7575484, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #2

Original Filing Form

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03073. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #4

Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (MFG) Modified on 11/12/2019 (MFG). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #3

Summons

#5

(#5) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California (DLB) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

6 #1

*Restricted*

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Eastern District of Missouri, 19-03073 Lewis, opened in California Northern District as 20-00068 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 176 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03073. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California (DLB) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-176) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (DLB) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis. Monsanto Company served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Adler, Enrique) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to E. Elliot Adler. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (MFG) Modified on 11/12/2019 (MFG). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7575484, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.