This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 07:50:52 (UTC).

Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David D. Noce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David D. Noce

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Counter Defendant

Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative

Defendant and Counter Claimant

International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Counter Defendant Attorney

Rick E. Temple

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICK E. TEMPLE, LLC

1358 E. Kingsley Street, Suite D

Springfield, MO 65804

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Amanda K. Hansen

Attorney at SCHUCHAT COOK

1221 Locust Street, Second Floor

St. Louis, MO 63103-2364

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2, Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (CLO) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM to Enforce Arbitration Award against plaintiff Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Amanda) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2 waiver signed on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Issued filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service )(Temple, Rick) Modified on 10/4/2019 (BAK). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

3 #1

Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rick E. Temple. Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7499051) by Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative.. (Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Attachment Arbitration Award

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award) against defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2 with receipt number AMOEDC-7498641, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Arbitration Award, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons)(Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2, Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (CLO) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hansen, Amanda) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM to Enforce Arbitration Award against plaintiff Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Amanda) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2 waiver signed on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#5) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Waiver of Service Issued filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service )(Temple, Rick) Modified on 10/4/2019 (BAK). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rick E. Temple. Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7499051) by Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative.. (Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award) against defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2 with receipt number AMOEDC-7498641, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Arbitration Award, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons)(Temple, Rick) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less