This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:33:20 (UTC).

Lewellyan v. Red River Rehab L L C et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Lewellyan filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Red River Rehab L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Dee D Drell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01105

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melanie Lewellyan

Defendants

Guardian Life Insurance Co

Red River Rehab, LLC

Red River Rehab L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Chase Cedars

Attorney at Lineage Law

P O Box 12511

Alexandria, LA 71315

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guardian Life Insurance Co, Red River Rehab L L C. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Red River Rehab L L C, Guardian Life Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4031244) filed by Melanie D. Lewellyan. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jeremy Chase Cedars added to party Melanie D. Lewellyan(pty:pla))(aty,Cedars, Jeremy) Modified to edit docket text on 8/22/2019 (ThomasSld, T). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/5/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guardian Life Insurance Co, Red River Rehab L L C. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Red River Rehab L L C, Guardian Life Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4031244) filed by Melanie D. Lewellyan. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jeremy Chase Cedars added to party Melanie D. Lewellyan(pty:pla))(aty,Cedars, Jeremy) Modified to edit docket text on 8/22/2019 (ThomasSld, T). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.