This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:09:33 (UTC).

Levy et al v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Levy filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Fire Marine Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61117

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abraham Levy

Amira Levy

Defendant

National Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angel Ivan Rivera

Attorney at MAC Legal P.A.

11 Via De Casas Surapt 204

Boynton Beach, FL 33426

Kristen Diane Montgomery

Attorney at MAC Legal PA.

3100 N. 29Th Ave33020

Hollywood, FL 33063

Menachem Mendel Kass

2800 Sw 73Rd Way Apt 1611

Davie, FL 33314

Michael Abraham Citron

Attorney at MAC Legal, PA

3100 N. 29Th Courtsuite 100

Hollywood, FL 33020

Michael Rubin

Attorney at MAC Legal, P.A.

4601 Sheridan Street, Suite 205

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Nicia Carolina Mejia

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N. Ashley Drivesuite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

William Roderick Lewis

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig, LLP

400 North Ashley Drivesuite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Donald Grayson Kelly

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 North Ashley Drivesuite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney(s) Nicia Carolina Mejia re #7 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Nicia Carolina Mejia has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Nicia Carolina Mejia (Mejia, Nicia) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for National Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Rubin on behalf of Abraham Levy, Amira Levy. Attorney Michael Rubin added to party Abraham Levy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Rubin added to party Amira Levy(pty:pla). (Rubin, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - In the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14720772, filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Diane Montgomery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Rubin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Abraham Citron