This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 09:16:52 (UTC).

Levine v. Merchants Credit Guide Company

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Levine filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Merchants Credit Guide Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00295

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theressa C. Levine

Defendant

Merchants Credit Guide Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Constantine Vlahakis

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Exhibit A

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#7

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and granting Request to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default. The parties will each bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending motions are denied as moot, and all court dates and pending deadlines are vacated. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/27/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Theressa C. Levine of Voluntary Dismissal and Request to Vacate Entry of Clerk's Default (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vlahakis, James) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Vacated by #8 OrderClerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Merchants Credit Guide Company (tkd, ) Modified on 7/27/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request by Theressa C. Levine for Clerk's Entry of Default against Merchants Credit Guide Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vlahakis, James) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theressa C. Levine. Merchants Credit Guide Company served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Vlahakis, James) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Merchants Credit Guide Company and emailed to pltf's attorney for service (tkd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Theressa C. Levine. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Constantine Vlahakis on behalf of Theressa C. Levine (Vlahakis, James) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Merchants Credit Guide Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8450328.), filed by Theressa C. Levine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vlahakis, James) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James C. Vlahakis