This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:58:21 (UTC).

Levi Strauss & Co. v. Connolly

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Levi Strauss Co filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Connolly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-04106

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Levi Strauss & Co.

Defendant

David Connolly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Bricker

Attorney at Verso Law Group LLP

209 Kearny Street, 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Levi Strauss & Co. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to David Connolly. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#8

(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Levi Strauss & Co... (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/2/2022) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Levi Strauss & Co.. David Connolly served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/25/2022) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Levi Strauss & Co.. David Connolly served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/25/2022) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Levi Strauss & Co... (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/2/2022) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to David Connolly. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Levi Strauss & Co. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against David Connolly ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17348235.). Filed byLevi Strauss & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Levi Strauss & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan T. Bricker