This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 08:36:47 (UTC).

Level at 401 LP v. First Company Products et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Level at 401 LP filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against First Company Products. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Level at 401 LP

Defendants

First Company Products

Copeland Corporation LLC

Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.

First Co.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael W. Knapp

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

214 North Tryon Street, Suite 3700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Matthew S. DeAntonio

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

214 North Tryon Street, Suite 3700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Anderson Finkelstein

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

Post Office Box 27525

Raleigh, NC 27611

Patrick D. McVey

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

James E. Breitenbucher

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

Richard T. Boyette

Attorney at Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP

P.O. Box 27808

Raleigh, NC 27611

Rabee R. El-Jaouhari

Attorney at Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP

5420 Wade Park Blvd, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27607

 

Court Documents

#27

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Caption

#26

#25

#24

23 #1

Exhibit 1 - First Co. Warranty

#23

#12

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit Ex. C - Affidavit of Service

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. B - Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. A - Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Amend Case Caption. The caption of this case is hereby amended to read: Level at 401, LP v. First Co., Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., and Copeland Corporation, LLC. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 4/30/2020. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnreferred the #25 Joint Rule 26(f) Report to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReferred the #25 Joint Rule 26(f) Report to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. for an order on scheduling. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #26 Joint MOTION to Amend Case Caption. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint MOTION to Amend Case Caption filed by Level at 401 LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Caption) (DeAntonio, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Level at 401 LP. (DeAntonio, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Level at 401 LP. (Knapp, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Level at 401 LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Co. Warranty) (Knapp, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick D. McVey on behalf of Copeland Corporation LLC, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (McVey, Patrick) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Appearance filed by James E. Breitenbucher on behalf of Copeland Corporation LLC, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (Breitenbucher, James) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Memorandum in Support regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Copeland Corporation LLC, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kenneth J. Monnier) (Finkelstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Copeland Corporation LLC, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (Finkelstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Copeland Corporation LLC identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Corporate Parent EECO, Inc., Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for Copeland Corporation LLC. (Finkelstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EECO, Inc., Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (Finkelstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Mark Anderson Finkelstein on behalf of Copeland Corporation LLC, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (Finkelstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Michael W. Knapp and Matthew S. DeAntonio of Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP at 214 N. Tryon Street, Suite 3700, Charlotte, NC 28202, Richard T. Boyette and Robert El-Jaouhari of CranfillSumner & Hartzog LLP at 5420 Wade park Blv., Suite 300, Raleigh, NC 2761-7808 mailed via US Mail on March 9, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Copeland Corporation LLC, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. from Wake County General Court of Justice Superior Court Division, case number 20-CVS-001656. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5344735), filed by Copeland Corporation LLC, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. A - Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex. C - Affidavit of Service) (Finkelstein, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST is a litigant

Latest cases where COPELAND CORPORATION LLC is a litigant