This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:12:03 (UTC).

LEVANDER v. BOROUGH OF JEFFERSON HILLS

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 LEVANDER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BOROUGH OF JEFFERSON HILLS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01629

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRICIA G. LEVANDER

Defendant

BOROUGH OF JEFFERSON HILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colleen Ramage Johnston

Attorney at Johnston Lykos, LLC

525 William Penn Place, 28Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRICIA G. LEVANDER. BOROUGH OF JEFFERSON HILLS waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Johnston, Colleen) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/19/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF JEFFERSON HILLS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5398413), filed by TRICIA G. LEVANDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRICIA G. LEVANDER. BOROUGH OF JEFFERSON HILLS waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Johnston, Colleen) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/19/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF JEFFERSON HILLS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5398413), filed by TRICIA G. LEVANDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.