This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:10:56 (UTC).

Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Youlee Yim You. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01968

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Youlee Yim You

 

Party Details

In Re

Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

In Re Attorney

Jared Hager

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1000 Sw 3Rd Ave, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER. In light of the foregoing analysis, the court finds that petitioner has established the requirements of the Hague Evidence Convention, as well as the statutory requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1782, and that the discretionary Intel factors weigh in favor of granting the Application. Accordingly, the court GRANTS petitioner's Application, appoints AUSA Jared Hager as Commissioner, and authorizes AUSA Hager to obtain the requested information from Wells Fargo. A copy of this order shall be included with the subpoena, which must include a return date of at least 21 days to allow Wells Fargo an opportunity to contest the subpoena. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 12/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Declaration of Jared D. Hager . Filed by Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland. (Related document(s): Petition, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hager, Jared) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) Petition - Application for Order Appointing Commissioner and Compelling Discovery (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)). Filed by Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland against Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland. (Hager, Jared) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#5) Order of Dismissal: The court has been advised by AUSA Jared Hager that the subpoena has been issued and complied with. Therefore this case is closed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER. In light of the foregoing analysis, the court finds that petitioner has established the requirements of the Hague Evidence Convention, as well as the statutory requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1782, and that the discretionary Intel factors weigh in favor of granting the Application. Accordingly, the court GRANTS petitioner's Application, appoints AUSA Jared Hager as Commissioner, and authorizes AUSA Hager to obtain the requested information from Wells Fargo. A copy of this order shall be included with the subpoena, which must include a return date of at least 21 days to allow Wells Fargo an opportunity to contest the subpoena. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 12/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Jared D. Hager . Filed by Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland. (Related document(s): Petition, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hager, Jared) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition - Application for Order Appointing Commissioner and Compelling Discovery (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)). Filed by Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland against Letter of Request From District Court in Piaseczno, Poland. (Hager, Jared) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.