This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/26/2023 at 19:37:25 (UTC).

Letoski et al v. The Coca-Cola Company

Case Summary

On 01/16/2023 Letoski filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against The Coca-Cola Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy L. Maldonado. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy L. Maldonado

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mark Letoski

Roger Fox

Defendant

The Coca-Cola Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spencer Sheehan

Attorney at Sheehan & Associates, P.C.

60 Cuttermill Road, Ste 412

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark Letoski, Roger Fox; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20238501.(Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Roger Fox, Mark Letoski by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 3/14/2023 at 10:00 a.m. by WebEx video conference. The parties are directed to file a joint Initial Status Report by 03/07/2023. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. The telephone number for the public is 650-479-3207; Access code: 23125373334. The parties will receive a Webex invitation by email. During the video hearing, the parties should turn off their cameras and mute their microphones until their case is called. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (ca, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 3/14/2023 at 10:00 a.m. by WebEx video conference. The parties are directed to file a joint Initial Status Report by 03/07/2023. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. The telephone number for the public is 650-479-3207; Access code: 23125373334. The parties will receive a Webex invitation by email. During the video hearing, the parties should turn off their cameras and mute their microphones until their case is called. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (ca, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Coca-Cola Company (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Roger Fox, Mark Letoski by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark Letoski, Roger Fox; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20238501.(Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less