This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:34:36 (UTC).

Leto et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Leto filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Lawrence King and Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-10115

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James Lawrence King

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Darold P. Leto

Elmira Leto

Defendants

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Davol, Inc.

Key West HMA, Inc. doing business as Lower Keys Medical Center

Key West HMA, LLC doing business as Lower Keys Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hugh J. Morgan

Attorney at Law Office of Hugh J. Morgan

317 Whitehead Streetpo Box 1117

Key West, FL 33041

Walter Samuel Holland

Attorney at W. Sam Holland, P.A.

12700 Biscayne Boulevardsuite 402

Miami, FL 33181

Roy D. Wasson

Courthouse Plaza --- Suite 60028 West Flagler Street

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorney

Edward Maurice Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drivesuite 900

Miami, FL 33131-2847

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group for C.R. Bard, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge James Lawrence King recused. Case reassigned to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (vjk) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#8

(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-77) transferring case to the Southern District of Ohio re: MDL 2846 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy D. Wasson on behalf of Darold P. Leto, Elmira Leto. Attorney Roy D. Wasson added to party Darold P. Leto(pty:pla), Attorney Roy D. Wasson added to party Elmira Leto(pty:pla). (Wasson, Roy) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy D. Wasson on behalf of Darold P. Leto, Elmira Leto. Attorney Roy D. Wasson added to party Darold P. Leto(pty:pla), Attorney Roy D. Wasson added to party Elmira Leto(pty:pla). (Wasson, Roy) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:21-cv-05736, filed 12/13/2021. (jua) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSYSTEM ENTRY - Case 4:21-cv-10115 electronically transferred out to Ohio Southern. (mc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-77) transferring case to the Southern District of Ohio re: MDL 2846 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO77) issued on December 2, 2021, by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL No. 2846). See In re: Davol, Inc./C.R. Bard, Inc., Polypropylene Hernia Mesh Prods. Liab. Litig., MDL No. 2846, [ECF No. 541] (S.D. Ohio Dec. 2, 2021). Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/2/2021. (jsi) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/2/2021. (jsi) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge James Lawrence King recused. Case reassigned to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (vjk) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group for C.R. Bard, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15200066, filed by Davol, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mullins, Edward) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 11/24/2021 (pcs). (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Davol, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward M. Mullins