Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2019 at 07:27:18 (UTC).

Lethas Pies, LLC et al v. Principis Capital, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 Lethas Pies, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Principis Capital, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05148

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lethas Pies, LLC

Timothy Glenn

Rhonda Glenn

Defendants

John Does 1-10

John Does 11-20

Principis Capital, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Chad Hutchinson

Attorney at Rmp LLP

5519 Hackett Rd., Ste 300

Springdale, AR 72762

Matthew R. Bishop

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 189

Eureka Springs, AR 72632

James Robert Renner

Attorney at Rmp LLP

5519 Hackett Rd., Ste 300

Springdale, AR 72762

Laurence M McCredy

Attorney at Reece Moore Pendergraft LLP

75 North East Ave., Ste. 500, P.O. Box 1788

Fayetteville, AR 72702

Seth M. Haines

Attorney at Reece Moore Pendergraft

5519 Hackett Rd., Suite 300

Springdale, AR 72762

Defendant Attorneys

Gary D. Marts, Jr.

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Jason B. Hendren

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLC

3333 Pinnacle Hills Parkway, Suite 510

Rogers, AR 72758

Eric Berger

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

3333 Pinnacle Hills Parkway, Suite 510

Rogers, AR 72758-8960

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

18 #1

Exhibit 1 - Reply in support of its motion to compel arbitration

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply in support of its motion to compel arbitration)(Marts, Gary) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#17

(#17) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

15 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#15

(#15) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rhonda Glenn, Timothy Glenn, Lethas Pies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hutchinson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#10

(#15) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rhonda Glenn, Timothy Glenn, Lethas Pies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hutchinson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

3 #3

Affidavit of Service of State Complaint

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#5) ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Principis Capital, LLC.(Marts, Gary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Principis Capital, LLC. (lgd) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

1 #4

Affidavit of Service of State Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B to State Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A to State Complaint

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Notice of Removal, #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Eric Berger, Jason B. Hendren. (lgd) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • (#21) TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 9/30/2019. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave. Principis Capital, LLC is directed to file its reply by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Friday, September 27, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 26, 2019. (jdw) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply in support of its motion to compel arbitration)(Marts, Gary) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rhonda Glenn, Timothy Glenn, Lethas Pies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hutchinson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Initial Disclosures Pending Resolution of its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Rhonda Glenn, Timothy Glenn, Lethas Pies, LLC. (Hutchinson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Initial Disclosures Pending Resolution of its Motion to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Stay Discovery and Initial Disclosures Pending Resolution of its Motion to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Hendren on behalf of Principis Capital, LLC. (Hendren, Jason) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Berger on behalf of Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Principis Capital, LLC.(Marts, Gary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Notice of Removal, #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Eric Berger, Jason B. Hendren. (lgd) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Notice of Removal fee received: $ 400, receipt number 46105007067. (lgd) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Principis Capital, LLC, filed by Lethas Pies, LLC, Timothy Glenn, Rhonda Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit of Service of State Complaint)(lgd) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/8/2019 (lgd) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Principis Capital, LLC. (lgd) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-19-1688, filed by John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Principis Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to State Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to State Complaint, #4 Affidavit of Service of State Complaint)(lgd) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary D. Marts Jr.