This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2020 at 12:11:56 (UTC).

LeSueur v. Glendale Police Department et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 LeSueur filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Glendale Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Z Boyle (PS), Susan M Brnovich and John Z Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01416

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

Referral Judges

John Z Boyle (PS)

John Z Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Marie LeSueur

Defendants

Unknown Hindes

Glendale Police Department

Unknown Party

Glendale, City of

Zane Hinde (per doc.

Zane Hinde

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Michael Cool

Attorney at Honor Law Group PLLC

4450 S Rural Rd., Ste. C220

Tempe, AZ 85282

Benjamin Leigh Rundall

Attorney at Honor Law Group PLLC

4450 S Rural Rd., Ste. C220

Tempe, AZ 85282

Defendant Attorneys

Michael David Bailey

Attorney at Glendale City Attorney

5850 W Glendale Ave., Ste. 450

Glendale, AZ 85301

Aaron Schepler

Attorney at Glendale City Attorney

5850 W Glendale Ave., Ste. 450

Glendale, AZ 85301

Michele Marie Iafrate

Attorney at Iafrate & Associates

649 N 2Nd Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85003

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/18/20. (EJA) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Glendale, Zane Hinde.(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Defendants City of Glendale and Sergeant Zane Hinde's Motion for substitution of Counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that Michele M. Iafrate and Iafrate & Associates be substituted in place of Michael D. Bailey and Aaron C. Schepler, as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/4/20. (EJA) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by City of Glendale, Zane Hinde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Amy Marie LeSueur.(Rundall, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The parties' Motion (doc. #7 ) is granted. 2. Plaintiff may file her amended complaint on or before August 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 8/17/2020. (LAD) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Plaintiff to File H

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Amy Marie LeSueur. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Plaintiff to File Her Amended Complaint)(Rundall, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) *ORDER - Plaintiff may filed an amended complaint on or before August 17, 2020. This matter is assigned to the standard track and referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/14/20. (EJA) *Modified to regenerate NEF on 8/14/2020 (SCH). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#5

(#5) STIPULATION and Joint Motion Re Filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Glendale Police Department, Unknown Hindes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schepler, Aaron) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE re: Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed in State Court by Glendale Police Department, Unknown Hindes . (Schepler, Aaron) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE re: Pending Motion by Amy Marie LeSueur . (Rundall, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #3

Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/18/20. (EJA) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Glendale, Zane Hinde.(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Defendants City of Glendale and Sergeant Zane Hinde's Motion for substitution of Counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that Michele M. Iafrate and Iafrate & Associates be substituted in place of Michael D. Bailey and Aaron C. Schepler, as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/4/20. (EJA) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by City of Glendale, Zane Hinde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Amy Marie LeSueur.(Rundall, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The parties' Motion (doc. #7 ) is granted. 2. Plaintiff may file her amended complaint on or before August 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 8/17/2020. (LAD) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Amy Marie LeSueur. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Plaintiff to File Her Amended Complaint)(Rundall, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *ORDER - Plaintiff may filed an amended complaint on or before August 17, 2020. This matter is assigned to the standard track and referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/14/20. (EJA) *Modified to regenerate NEF on 8/14/2020 (SCH). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and Joint Motion Re Filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Glendale Police Department, Unknown Hindes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schepler, Aaron) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE re: Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed in State Court by Glendale Police Department, Unknown Hindes . (Schepler, Aaron) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE re: Pending Motion by Amy Marie LeSueur . (Rundall, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket***State Court record received on 7/17/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Amy Marie LeSueur: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Unknown Hindes on 2/20/20.***filed in State Court on 3/09/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/17/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-094050. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18484104 filed by Glendale Police Department, Unknown Hindes. (submitted by Aaron Schepler) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Schepler(Designation Retained)