This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:43:27 (UTC).

LESNICK et al v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 LESNICK filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANGELA LESNICK

THOMAS LESNICK

Defendants

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC.

ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC

JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC

ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY

TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.

In Re

ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EVAN M. JANUSH

Attorney at THE LANIER LAW FIRM

126 East 56Th St 6Th Fl

New York, NY 10022

JASON S. GOLDSTEIN

Attorney at THE LANIER LAW FIRM

126 East 56Th St 6Th Fl

New York, NY 10022

KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER

Attorney at LANIER LAW FIRM

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy North, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77064

RICHARD D. MEADOW

Attorney at THE LANIER LAW FIRM, PLLC

126 East 56Th Street, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

W. MARK LANIER

Attorney at LANIER LAW FIRM

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy N, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77064

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Designation Forum

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 1/18/22, for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketThis case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found #Here (gh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (gh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13118575) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANGELA LESNICK, THOMAS LESNICK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Designation Forum)(MEADOW, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ortho McNeil Pharmaceutical Inc is a litigant