This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 08:34:41 (UTC).

In Re Curious Apparel Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 In Re Curious Apparel Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09933

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sam S. Lesllie

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Q Textile, Inc.

Dietz International Public Adjusters

Elliot Tishbi

A Plus Fabric, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendants

Kevin Yong Koh, Sr.

Chi Hwan Jung

Seung Jae Baek

Gum Sook Jung

Nikki Hwang

Kevin Koh

Soon Hee Kwon

Cargo Union Co., LTD.

Prime Business Credit, Inc.

Byong J. Ahn

Raw Edge Clothing, Inc.

Rachel Jung

SKJ Enterprises

Exit One Mode, Inc.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica Lynn Bagdanov

David Seror

Ryan F Coy

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis H Altman

David Richard Haberbush

Lane Kathleen Bogard

Vanessa Marie Haberbush

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Maria Lucinda Garcia

Michael B Wilk

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

24 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

24 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#24

#20

6 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

6 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

6 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE TO THE BANKRUPTCY COURT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court DENIES the Movants' Motion to Withdraw the Reference #1 without prejudice. If the bankruptcy court determines that non-core claims predominate the Adversary Proceeding, or if Movants are ultimately entitled to a jury trial on any remaining claims, Movants may file a renewed motion to withdraw the reference to this Court. (gk) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTES OF MOTION to Withdraw Reference; Motion Hearing held before Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The motion hearing is held telephonically. Counsel, the Court and court staff all appear in that manner. Recording or rebroadcasting of the proceedings is strictly prohibited. The motion hearing is held. Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMITTION and a ruling will be issued. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (shb) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael B Wilk counsel for ThirdParty Defendant Prime Business Credit, Inc.. Adding Michael Wilk as counsel of record for Prime Business Credit, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney for Secured Creditor Prime Business Credit, Inc.. (Attorney Michael B Wilk added to party Prime Business Credit, Inc.(pty:3pd))(Wilk, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lane Kathleen Bogard counsel for Defendants A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi, Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi. Adding Lane K. Bogard as counsel of record for A-Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textiles, Inc., Elliot Tishbi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants/Third Party Plaintiffs A-Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textiles, Inc., and Elliot Tishbi. (Attorney Lane Kathleen Bogard added to party A Plus Fabric, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lane Kathleen Bogard added to party A Plus Fabric, Inc.(pty:3pp), Attorney Lane Kathleen Bogard added to party Q Textile, Inc.(pty:3pp), Attorney Lane Kathleen Bogard added to party Q Textile, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lane Kathleen Bogard added to party Elliot Tishbi(pty:3pp), Attorney Lane Kathleen Bogard added to party Elliot Tishbi(pty:dft))(Bogard, Lane) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court, on its own motion, sets a telephonic hearing on the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Dkt. No. #1 ) for December 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court has also continued the time of the hearing from 9:00 a.m. to 10:00 a.m. Call-in instructions will be emailed to everyone listed on the docket prior to the hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court [Docket No. 23] filed by Defendants A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi, Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Altman, Louis) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY filed by Defendants A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi, Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi to Response in Opposition to Motion #20 (Altman, Louis) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) OPPOSITION filed by ThirdParty Defendant Prime Business Credit, Inc.. (Attorney Maria Lucinda Garcia added to party Prime Business Credit, Inc.(pty:3pd))(Garcia, Maria) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Opposition to Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Plaintiff Sam S. Lesllie. (Coy, Ryan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Sam S. Lesllie. (Attorney Ryan F Coy added to party Sam S. Lesllie(pty:pla))(Coy, Ryan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Defendants and 3rd Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi. (Altman, Louis) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Withdraw Reference by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 is set for hearing. Hearing regarding Motion to Withdraw Reference (Complaint) set for 11/23/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court [Docket No. 1] filed by Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Altman, Louis) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi. Related Case(s): 2:19-bk-24531-SK; 2:20-ap-01148-SK (Altman, Louis) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi, (Attorney Louis H Altman added to party Q Textile, Inc.(pty:3pp))(Altman, Louis) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Q Textile, Inc., Elliot Tishbi (Altman, Louis) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Elliot Tishbi. (Altman, Louis) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 2:20-ap-01148-SK to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 2:19-bk-24531-SK Receipt No: ACACDC-28753119 - Fee: $181, filed by Third Party Plaintiffs A Plus Fabric, Inc., Elliot Tishbi, Elliot Tishbi. (Attorney Louis H Altman added to party A Plus Fabric, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Louis H Altman added to party A Plus Fabric, Inc.(pty:3pp), Attorney Louis H Altman added to party Elliot Tishbi(pty:3pp), Attorney Louis H Altman added to party Elliot Tishbi(pty:dft))(Altman, Louis) Modified on 12/7/2020 (shb). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less