This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2019 at 07:05:33 (UTC).

Leslie v. LCF et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Leslie filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against LCF. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00821

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sidney JD Leslie

Lawton, OK 73501

Defendants

LCF

Mark Knutson

Warden FNU Smith

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Envelope

12 #1

Attachment 1 - Cover Letter

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Envelope

7 #1

Attachment 1 - Cover Letter

#7

6 #1

Envelope

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Complete exhusted adminstrative remedy

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #11 filed by Sidney JD Leslie. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Court: (1) dismiss the individual capacity claim against GEO without prejudice; (2) dismiss the official capacity claim, against Defendant Smith, LCF and GEO with prejudice; (3) dismiss the official capacity claim against Defendant Knutson without prejudice; and (4) dismiss individual capacity claims against Defendants Smith and Knutson without prejudice. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge in the captioned matter. Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/8/19. (mc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. See order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/2/19. (mc) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File; The Plaintiff made his initial partial payment on October 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/2/2019. (mc) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Receipt for Money Received from Sidney JD Leslie in the amount of $20.50, receipt number OKW500076378 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance on Complaint is $329.50. Receipt mailed to Sidney JD Leslie #490309 LAWTON-LCF 8607 SE Flower Mound Rd Lawton, OK 73501. (nv) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time re #5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Sidney JD Leslie. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 3 SUMMONS(ES) by Sidney JD Leslie. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee as set forth hereafter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before September 30, 2019, Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $20.26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/11/19. (mc) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin.Entered by the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 9/5/2019. (ac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PREVIOUS Cases (ac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sidney JD Leslie. (ac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Knutson(D.O.C. Director Designee in his individal capacity), Mark Knutson(D.O.C. Director Designee in his offical capacity), LCF(GEO, Unknown Owners in official capacity), LCF(GEO, Unknown Owner Individually), FNU Smith(Warden in his individual capacity), FNU Smith(Warden in his official capacity) filed by Sidney JD Leslie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complete exhusted adminstrative remedy, #2 Envelope)(ac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LCF, Inc. d/b/a Brandy's Gentlemen's Club is a litigant