This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2019 at 08:10:26 (UTC).

Leslie v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Leslie filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eleanor L. Ross and Russell G. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04001

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ron Leslie

Atlanta, GA 30358

Defendant

Bank of America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Anthony Rogers

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP-GA

1230 Peachtree Street, N.E., Promenade, Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309-3534

Jarrod Sean Mendel

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP-GA

1230 Peachtree Street, N.E., Promenade, Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309-3534

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mendel, Jarrod) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ron Leslie. (sap) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ron Leslie. (sap) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Bank of America Corporation. (Rogers, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit 1

2 #1

Brief

#2

(#2) MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1)(Rogers, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8916203) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mendel, Jarrod) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #2 MOTION for More Definite Statement, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (jpa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ron Leslie. (sap) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ron Leslie. (sap) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures of Bank of America Corporation. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Bank of America Corporation. (Rogers, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1)(Rogers, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8916203) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL ANTHONY ROGERS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JARROD S MENDEL