This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 10:45:56 (UTC).

Lerner v. ADESA Nevada, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Lerner filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ADESA Nevada, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02304

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Lerner

N Las Vegas, NV 89084

Defendants

Adesa Corporation, LLC

KAR Auction Services, Inc.

ADESA Nevada, LLC a Nevada limited liability corporation doing business as ADESA Las Vegas

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Cover email

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ADESA Nevada, LLC, Adesa Corporation, LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc. by Joshua Lerner. No changes to parties. (DRS) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Second Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lerner's amended complaint (ECF No. #4 ), including the supplement to the second amended complaint (ECF No. #7 ), is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lerner has until Thursday, February 25, 2021 to file a second amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if a second amended complaint is later filed, the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue summons on the amended complaint. The Court will issue a screening order on the amended complaint and address the issuance of summons at that time, if applicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Joshua Lerner (DRS) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SECOND MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua Lerner. (Attachments: #1 Cover email) (DRS) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 2/10/2021 to either pay the filing fee in full or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis as outlined in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ADESA Nevada, LLC, Adesa Corporation, LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc. by Joshua Lerner. No changes to parties. (DRS) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Included in mailing: Notice and Consent to email service - DRS) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua Lerner. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (DRS) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAR Auction Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adesa, Inc. is a litigant