This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 09:18:10 (UTC).

Leopard et al v. Local in Memphis, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Leopard filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Local in Memphis, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas L. Parker and Tu M. Pham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02154

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bailey Leopard

Amanda Levitch

Defendants

Local in Memphis, LLC

The Vault on GE Patterson, LLC

E & H 2.0, LLC

Tyson Bridge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Benjamin Alan Matthews

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER Granting in Part #13 Motion to Approve Alternative Means of Service. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/3/2022. (JRS) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

13 #2

Exhibit B - Kirk Manuel Affidavit

13 #1

Exhibit A - PDQ Affidavit

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Bailey Leopard, Amanda Levitch as to All Defendants. (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Bailey Leopard (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for B. Alan Matthews by All Plaintiffs. (Matthews, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Bailey Leopard of Consent to Join of Madison Erwin, JeBee Harvey and Emma Shea (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Alan Matthews on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Matthews, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

6 #3

Tyson Bridge

6 #2

The Vault on GE Patterson, LLC

6 #1

Local in Memphis, LLC

6 #6

Main Document

#2

(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

1 #6

Exhibit A - Named Plaintiffs' Consents to Join

1 #5

Summons to be issued

1 #4

Summons to be issued

1 #3

Summons to be issued

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Granting in Part #13 Motion to Approve Alternative Means of Service. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/3/2022. (JRS) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION Approve Alternative Means of Service by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PDQ Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Kirk Manuel Affidavit)(Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Bailey Leopard, Amanda Levitch as to All Defendants. (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Bailey Leopard (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docket(#10) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Plaintiffs move to permit Attorney B. Alan Matthews to withdraw as counsel. (ECF No. 9 at PageID 42.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Attorney Robert E. Morelli, III will remain as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/7/2022. (JRS) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for B. Alan Matthews by All Plaintiffs. (Matthews, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Bailey Leopard of Consent to Join of Madison Erwin, JeBee Harvey and Emma Shea (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Alan Matthews on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Matthews, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Tyson Bridge, E & H 2.0, LLC, Local in Memphis, LLC, The Vault on GE Patterson, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Local in Memphis, LLC, #2 The Vault on GE Patterson, LLC, #3 Tyson Bridge)(agj) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tyson Bridge, E & H 2.0, LLC, Local in Memphis, LLC, The Vault on GE Patterson, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3826411), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued, #3 Summons to be issued, #4 Summons to be issued, #5 Summons to be issued, #6 Exhibit A - Named Plaintiffs' Consents to Join)(Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Alan Matthews

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Emmett Turner, IV