This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 13:08:33 (UTC).

Leonard v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 Leonard filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr and Bradley W. Rath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judge

Bradley W. Rath

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delphine Leonard

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James K. Wetzel

Attorney at JAMES K. WETZEL, ATTORNEY

P.O. Box I

Gulfport, MS 39502

Garner J. Wetzel

Attorney at JAMES K. WETZEL & ASSOCIATES

1701 24Th Avenue

Gulfport, MS 39501

Defendant Attorneys

W. Pemble DeLashmet

Attorney at DELASHMET & MARCHAND, PC

P. O. Box 2047, 462 Dauphin Street (36602)

Mobile, AL 36652

Keith B. Franklin

Attorney at DELASHMET & MARCHAND, PC

P. O. Box 2047, 462 Dauphin Street (36602)

Mobile, AL 36652

 

Court Documents

19 #7

Attachment NPS - Emergency Room Group, Ltd.

19 #6

Attachment NPS - Bay Area ENT

19 #5

Attachment NPS - John W. Benus, DPM

19 #4

Attachment NPS - Southeastern Dermatology Group

19 #3

Attachment NPS - The Dermatology Clinic, PLLC

19 #2

Attachment NPS - Mississippi Asthmas & Allergy Clinic

19 #1

Attachment NPS - Beacon Behavioral Hospital Northshore

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Delphine Leonard (Wetzel, James) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

3 #5

Attachment NPS - Novitas Solutions, Inc.

3 #4

Attachment NPS - Humana Military Tricare East

3 #3

Attachment NPS - PT Solutions

3 #1

Attachment NPS - Memorial Hospital at Gulfport/ Memorial Physicians Clinics

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court File

1 #1

Main Document

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Attachment NPS - Beacon Behavioral Hospital Northshore, #2 Attachment NPS - Mississippi Asthmas & Allergy Clinic, #3 Attachment NPS - The Dermatology Clinic, PLLC, #4 Attachment NPS - Southeastern Dermatology Group, #5 Attachment NPS - John W. Benus, DPM, #6 Attachment NPS - Bay Area ENT, #7 Attachment NPS - Emergency Room Group, Ltd.)(DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Delphine Leonard (Wetzel, James) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Delphine Leonard (Wetzel, James) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Attachment NPS - Acadian Ambulance, #2 Attachment NPS - ACS Primary Care Physicians, #3 Attachment NPS - Suncoast Pain Management, #4 Attachment NPS - Biloxi HMA Physician Management, Inc., #5 Attachment NPS - Back & Neck Care Center, LLC, #6 Attachment NPS - Seaside Physical Therapy, #7 Attachment NPS - North Bay Physical Therapy, #8 Attachment NPS - Winn Dixie Pharmacy-SE Grocers, #9 Attachment NPS - Tri-County Eye Clinic)(DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13. Attorney is advised that when filing a document with combined discovery, each part of the discovery must be filed separately. Counsel should file document #13 again using the event code "Notice of Service of Request for Production of Documents".(wld) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for a four week trial calendar beginning on 11/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18-19/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 5/3/2023. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2022. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2022. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/1/2023. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/1/2023. Motions due by 5/17/2023. Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath. ADR Report due by 10/11/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2023. EDT: 2-3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 11/1/2022 (AB) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/1/2022. PARTICIPANTS: James K. Wetzel (counsel for Plaintiff); Keith B. Franklin (counsel for Defendant). A Case Management Order will be entered. (AB) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Franklin on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Franklin, Keith) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Hearing: Due to a scheduling conflict with Counsel for Plaintiff, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 11/1/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath. Counsel will follow all other instructions given in the Rule 16(a) Initial Order #6 . (AB) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Anthony Piazza on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Piazza, John) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Attachment NPS - Merit Health Biloxi, #2 Attachment NPS - Jernigan Chiropractic, #3 Attachment NPS - GCI Radiology, PLLC, #4 Attachment NPS - SMB Radiology)(DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath. (AB) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Delphine Leonard (Wetzel, Garner) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Garner J. Wetzel on behalf of Delphine Leonard (Wetzel, Garner) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Attachment NPS - Memorial Hospital at Gulfport/ Memorial Physicians Clinics, #2 Attachment NPS - 81st Medical Group, #3 Attachment NPS - PT Solutions, #4 Attachment NPS - Humana Military Tricare East, #5 Attachment NPS - Novitas Solutions, Inc.)(DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Harrison County County Court - Second Judicial District, case number D2402-22-417. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 4928803) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith B. Franklin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer W. Pemble DeLashmet