This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:58:56 (UTC).

Leonard v. Tennessee, State of

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Leonard filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Tennessee, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eli J. Richardson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00707

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Corrie J. Leonard

Nashville, TN 37218

Defendant

Tennessee, State of

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: More than 30 days have passed with no action by Ms. Leonard. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to close this case without judgment. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/29/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Corrie Leonard, a state inmate in the Debra Johnson Rehabilitation Center in Nashville, Tennessee, filed a pro se complaint that is styled as an action in the Middle Division of the Tennessee Claims Commission but was mailed to this Court. (Doc. No. #1 at 1, 15.) Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return Ms. Leonard's original documents to her and retain a copy for the Court's file. If Ms. Leonard takes no further action in this Court within 30 days, this case will be closed without judgment. However, if Ms. Leonard did indeed intend to bring her claim against the State of Tennessee in this Court, she is advised that a complaint may not be filed as a civil action or considered on the merits unless it is accompanied by a $400 filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Ms. Leonard a new blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Administrative Order 93. If she seeks to proceed with this lawsuit, despite the shortcomings mentioned above, she MUST either pay the $400.00 filing fee in full or complete the IFP application and return the properly completed application, along with a current six-month trust account statement, to the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/24/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with the return of the original Complaint and an IFP application.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 8/24/2020 (mg). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Tennessee, State of, filed by Corrie J. Leonard.(mg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: More than 30 days have passed with no action by Ms. Leonard. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to close this case without judgment. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/29/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Corrie Leonard, a state inmate in the Debra Johnson Rehabilitation Center in Nashville, Tennessee, filed a pro se complaint that is styled as an action in the Middle Division of the Tennessee Claims Commission but was mailed to this Court. (Doc. No. #1 at 1, 15.) Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return Ms. Leonard's original documents to her and retain a copy for the Court's file. If Ms. Leonard takes no further action in this Court within 30 days, this case will be closed without judgment. However, if Ms. Leonard did indeed intend to bring her claim against the State of Tennessee in this Court, she is advised that a complaint may not be filed as a civil action or considered on the merits unless it is accompanied by a $400 filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Ms. Leonard a new blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Administrative Order 93. If she seeks to proceed with this lawsuit, despite the shortcomings mentioned above, she MUST either pay the $400.00 filing fee in full or complete the IFP application and return the properly completed application, along with a current six-month trust account statement, to the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/24/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with the return of the original Complaint and an IFP application.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 8/24/2020 (mg). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tennessee, State of, filed by Corrie J. Leonard.(mg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less