This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 07:01:52 (UTC).

Leonard v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On April 2, 2021, Gary Leonard (“Plaintiff”), represented by Randi Kassan of Sanders Phillips Grossman LLC, filed a personal injury lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc., previously d/b/a as PAX Labs, Inc. and PLOOM Inc & Ors. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking compensatory, treble, and punitive damages, with interest and costs for alleged strict and products liability, negligence, fraud, unjust enrichment, violation of laws and breach of express and implied warranty by the Defendants. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with Judge William H. Orrick presiding.

 

In its complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “Plaintiff used JUUL during the time period including from 2015 to May 2019 and that use caused and or substantially contributed to his/her injury.” The Plaintiff(s) experienced the physical condition, injury or illness viz. Addiction, Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease (COPD) and Non-contagious, bilateral Pneumonia, alleged to have been caused and or contributed to as a substantial factor by JUUL.

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “The physical condition, injury or illness alleged in the complaint occurred on or about June 4, 2018 and April 29, 2019.”

 

There are sixteen claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. That includes the claim for alleged Strict Liability- for alleged design defect, alleged failure to warn and alleged manufacturing defect; alleged products liability- for negligent design, failure to warn and negligent manufacturing; alleged negligence and/or gross negligence; alleged negligent failure to recall/retrofit; alleged negligent misrepresentation; alleged fraud; alleged fraudulent concealment; alleged conspiracy to commit fraud; alleged unjust enrichment; alleged violation of Unfair Trade Practices/Consumer Protection Law under the State of North Carolina; alleged breach of express warranty; and alleged breach of an implied warranty of merchantability.

 

In its prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass a judgment against Defendants for compensatory, treble, and punitive damages, medical monitoring to diagnose JUUL induced injuries at an earlier date to allow for timely treatment and prevention of exacerbation of injuries, together with interest, costs of suit, attorneys' fees, and all such other relief as the Court deems proper, equitable and just.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02396

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Leonard

Defendants

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Juul Labs, Inc., previously d/b/a Pax Labs, Inc. and Ploom Inc.

Altria Enterprises LLC

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

McLane Company, Inc.

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Juul Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randi Kassan

Attorney at MILBERG COLEMAN BRYSON PHILLIPS GROSSMAN, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/29/2021) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

4 #8

Summons Eby-Brown Company

4 #7

Summons Altria Client Services LLC

4 #6

Summons Altria Group Distribution Company

4 #5

Summons Altria Group, Inc.

4 #4

Summons Philip Morris USA, Inc.

4 #3

Summons Altria Enterprises LLC

4 #2

Summons Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

4 #1

Summons McLane Company

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons McLane Company, #2 Summons Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., #3 Summons Altria Enterprises LLC, #4 Summons Philip Morris USA, Inc., #5 Summons Altria Group, Inc., #6 Summons Altria Group Distribution Company, #7 Summons Altria Client Services LLC, #8 Summons Eby-Brown Company)(Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Juul Labs, Inc., previously d/b/a Pax Labs, Inc. and Ploom Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15786221.). Filed byGary Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/29/2021) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. [err201] PLEASE RE-FILE, USE ONLY ONE SUMMONS WITH ATTACHMENT FOR DEFENDANTS INFORMATION. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED. This filing will not be processe d by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Proposed Summons, filed by Gary Leonard (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons McLane Company, #2 Summons Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., #3 Summons Altria Enterprises LLC, #4 Summons Philip Morris USA, Inc., #5 Summons Altria Group, Inc., #6 Summons Altria Group Distribution Company, #7 Summons Altria Client Services LLC, #8 Summons Eby-Brown Company)(Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. [err201] PLEASE RE-FILE, USE ONLY ONE SUMMONS WITH ATTACHMENT FOR DEFENDANTS INFORMATION.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re -file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Gary Leonard (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Leonard v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-02396-WHO cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Juul Labs, Inc., previously d/b/a Pax Labs, Inc. and Ploom Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15786221.). Filed byGary Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kassan, Randi) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUUL Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where McLane Company, Inc. is a litigant