This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 07:29:43 (UTC).

Leonard v. Aflac, Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Leonard filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Aflac, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyle Leonard

Defendants

Melissa Stewart

Jackie Williams

Aflac, Incorporated

American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus

American Family Life Assurance of New York

Melissa Murphy

Jacqueline Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip A. Oswald

Attorney at Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC

227 Washington Street, Suite 1C

Saratoga Springs, NY 12866

Defendant Attorneys

David Wohlstadter

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Brooks A Suttle

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree St., Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Letter Motion from Phillip A. Oswald, Esq. for Kyle Leonard requesting a brief adjournment of the current deadlines under the G.O. 25 Filing Order submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Oswald, Phillip) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#14

(#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to Brooks A. Suttle, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309 (hmr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#13

(#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to R. Steve Ensor, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309. (hmr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#12

(#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to R. Steve Ensor, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309. (hmr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#11

(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to Brooks A. Suttle, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309. (hmr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

9 #5

Exhibit(s) Ensor Cert. of Good Standing (GA)

9 #4

Exhibit(s) Ensor E-File Registration Form

9 #3

Exhibit(s) Ensor Petition for Admission

9 #2

Declaration Sponsor Declaration

9 #1

Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Defendants; Attorney R. Steve Ensor,. Phone number is 404-881-7000. Admissions due by 3/17/2022. [Copy of this Notice, together with a courtesy copy of the Dkt. No. #3 GO #25 was mailed to Attorney Ensor via regular mail on 3/3/2022.] (hmr) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, American Family Life Assurance of New York, Melissa Stewart, Jackie Williams.(Wohlstadter, David) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#6

(#6) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, American Family Life Assurance of New York. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance of New York, Melissa Stewart, Jackie Williams, and American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus; Attorney Brooks A. Suttle, Email address is brooks.suttle@alston.com. Phone number is (404) 881-7000. Admissions due by 3/9/2022. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance of New York, Melissa Stewart, Jackie Williams, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus.; Attorney R. Steve Ensor, Esq., Email address is steve.ensor@alston.com. Phone number is (404)881-7000. Admissions due by 3/9/2022. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/28/2022 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/21/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: On March 17, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Letter Request, with the consent of Defendants, seeking an adjournment of the deadlines under General Order #25 to allow the parties to submit this matter arbitration. Dkt. No. #15 . Based upon the reasons set forth in Plaintiff's submission and upon the consent of the parties, the request is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for March 28, 2022 before the undersigned and the deadline for the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date. Counsel are directed to file a Status Report by May 20, 2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/21/2022. (mab) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter Motion from Phillip A. Oswald, Esq. for Kyle Leonard requesting a brief adjournment of the current deadlines under the G.O. 25 Filing Order submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Oswald, Phillip) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to Brooks A. Suttle, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309 (hmr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to R. Steve Ensor, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309. (hmr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to R. Steve Ensor, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309. (hmr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, sent to Brooks A. Suttle, Esq. Address sent to 1201 West Peachtree Street, Atlanta, GA 30309. (hmr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert Steve Ensor is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf o Defendants. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/14/2022. (mab) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Steve Ensor Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5832253. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Sponsor Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Ensor Petition for Admission, #4 Exhibit(s) Ensor E-File Registration Form, #5 Exhibit(s) Ensor Cert. of Good Standing (GA)) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Suttle, Brooks) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Defendants; Attorney R. Steve Ensor,. Phone number is 404-881-7000. Admissions due by 3/17/2022. [Copy of this Notice, together with a courtesy copy of the Dkt. No. #3 GO #25 was mailed to Attorney Ensor via regular mail on 3/3/2022.] (hmr) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, American Family Life Assurance of New York, Melissa Stewart, Jackie Williams.(Wohlstadter, David) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Aflac, Incorporated answer due 3/2/2022; American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus answer due 3/2/2022; American Family Life Assurance of New York answer due 3/2/2022; Melissa Stewart answer due 3/2/2022; Jackie Williams answer due 3/2/2022. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, American Family Life Assurance of New York. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance of New York, Melissa Stewart, Jackie Williams, and American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus; Attorney Brooks A. Suttle, Email address is brooks.suttle@alston.com. Phone number is (404) 881-7000. Admissions due by 3/9/2022. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance of New York, Melissa Stewart, Jackie Williams, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus.; Attorney R. Steve Ensor, Esq., Email address is steve.ensor@alston.com. Phone number is (404)881-7000. Admissions due by 3/9/2022. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/28/2022 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/21/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff Kyle Leonard in NYS Supreme Court, Albany County. (ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Albany County, case number 900316-22 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5814481) filed by Aflac, Incorporated, American Family Life Assurance of New York, Melissa Stewart, Jackie Williams, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFLAC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip A. Oswald