This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:21:11 (UTC).

Leonard et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Leonard filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Railroad Passenger Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin H. Settle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-06099

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin H. Settle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hannah M Leonard

Cody A Clark

Emema Tulafono-Levaula

Defendants

NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION dba AMTRAK

National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Michael Davis

Attorney at DAVIS LAW GROUP

2101 Fourth Ave Ste 1030

Seattle, WA 98121

Maridith E. Ramsey

Attorney at DAVIS LAW GROUP

2101 Fourth Ave Ste 1030

Seattle, WA 98121

Defendant Attorneys

Katie Bass

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Tim D. Wackerbarth

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Warren E. Babb, Jr.

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Andrew Gordon Yates

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Mark S Landman

Attorney at LANDMAN CORSI BALLAINE & FORD

120 Broadway, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10271

John A Bonventre

Attorney at LANDMAN CORSI BALLAINE & FORD

One Gateway Center 4Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Andrew G. Yates re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#11

(#11) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John A. Bonventre FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6050630 (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark S. Landman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6050604 (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/5/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number N/A; (Receipt # 0981-6014704), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Related Cases, #2 Exhibit A Complaint)(Wackerbarth, Tim) Modified on 11/20/2019 (KB). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#8

(#8) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Yates, Andrew) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John A Bonventre for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark S Landman for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John A. Bonventre FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6050630 (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark S. Landman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6050604 (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/5/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Yates, Andrew) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • PLEASE DISREGARD, DOCKETED IN ERROR. NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, National Railroad Passenger Corporation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/26/2019. (ERA) Modified on 11/19/2019 (ERA). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECLARATION of Andrew G. Yates re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wackerbarth, Tim) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number N/A; (Receipt # 0981-6014704), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Related Cases, #2 Exhibit A Complaint)(Wackerbarth, Tim) Modified on 11/20/2019 (KB). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.