This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 09:52:59 (UTC).

Leon v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Leon filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against U S Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina D Cannon and Amy Totenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02786

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Regina D Cannon

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alejandro Garcia Leon

Defendants

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Executive Office for Immigration Review

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice (rlh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Final Report and Recommendation #2 as the opinion of the Court. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/30/21. (rlh) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Service of #2 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/10/21. (rlb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#2

(#2) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #1 Complaint for Mandamus Relief be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the reference to the Magistrate Judge Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/10/21. (rlb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certificate of Service

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief, I-589 Application for Asylum and for Withholding of Removal filed by Alejandro Garcia Leon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (rlh) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alejandro Garcia Leon re #4 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #5 Clerk's Judgment. (rlh) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice (rlh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Final Report and Recommendation #2 as the opinion of the Court. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/30/21. (rlh) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint for Mandamus Relief, filed by Alejandro Garcia Leon, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlh) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alejandro Garcia Leon re #2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rlb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Service of #2 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/10/21. (rlb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: For the purpose of dismissal, Plaintiff is GRANTED in forma pauperis status. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/10/21 within #2 R&R. (rlb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #1 Complaint for Mandamus Relief be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the reference to the Magistrate Judge Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/10/21. (rlb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Complaint for Mandamus Relief for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (rlb) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief, I-589 Application for Asylum and for Withholding of Removal filed by Alejandro Garcia Leon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW is a litigant

Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant