This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2020 at 09:24:06 (UTC).

Leon v. Clarke Cook House, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Leon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Clarke Cook House, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Leon

Defendant

Clarke Cook House, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas J. Parrillo

Attorney at Marin and Barrett, Inc.

Penthouse Suite, 127 Dorrance Street

Providence, RI 02903

Christopher E Hultquist

Attorney at Hultquist Law, P.C

56 Pine Street, Suite 200

Providence, RI 02882

Defendant Attorney

Lisa M. Cronin

Attorney at Law Office of John P. Calabrese

500 Enterprise Drive, Suite 2C

Rocky Hill, CT 06067

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketTEXT PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial disclosures shall be made by 12/30/20; Factual Discovery to close by 6/14/2021; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/14/2021; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/16/2021; Expert Discovery shall close by 9/16/21 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 10/25/2021;- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/11/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketHEARING CANCELLED: The telephonic rule 16 conference scheduled for Friday, 12/11/20 at 9:00 a.m. before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 16 STATEMENT by Clarke Cook House, LLC. (Cronin, Lisa) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 16 STATEMENT of Plaintiff by Elizabeth Leon. (Hultquist, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 12/11/2020 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.. Dial in instructions will be provided to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clarke Cook House, LLC ANSWER to Complaint by Clarke Cook House, LLC.(Cronin, Lisa) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Leon. Clarke Cook House, LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Hultquist, Christopher) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Clarke Cook House, LLC. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1560272 ), filed by Elizabeth Leon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Parrillo, Nicholas) (Attachment 1 replaced with signed version on 10/20/2020) (Hicks, Alyson). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Clarke Cook House, LLC. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1560272 ), filed by Elizabeth Leon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Parrillo, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher E. Hultquist