This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2019 at 07:01:01 (UTC).

Lenk v. Monolithic Power Systems Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Lenk filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Monolithic Power Systems Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03791

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Lenk

Chandler, AZ 85286

Defendants

Maurice Sciammas

Monolithic Power Systems Incorporated

Sacks, Ricketts, and Case LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kent S Brockelman

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Kimberly A Fatica

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Jeffrey Alan Snyder

Attorney at Shuman Snyder LLP

525 Middlefield Road, Suite 100

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Joseph Patrick McMonigle

Attorney at Long & Levit LLP

465 California Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joseph Patrick McMonigle CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (McMonigle, Joseph) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joseph Patrick McMonigle CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (McMonigle, Joseph) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

34 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#34

(#34) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (approving #30 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2019. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

33 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#33

(#33) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (approving #29 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2019. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

31 #1

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Monolithic Power Systems, In

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jeffrey Alan Snyder CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (Snyder, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jeffrey Alan Snyder CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (Snyder, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#8

(#9) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) states a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Doc. #6 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Doc. #8 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Request for Electronic Noticing (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/18. (DXD) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#7

(#9) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) states a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Doc. #6 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Doc. #8 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Request for Electronic Noticing (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/18. (DXD) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#6

(#9) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) states a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Doc. #6 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Doc. #8 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Request for Electronic Noticing (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/18. (DXD) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#3

(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-933-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#2

(#9) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) states a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Doc. #6 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Doc. #8 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Request for Electronic Noticing (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/18. (DXD) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) states a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Doc. #6 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Doc. #8 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Request for Electronic Noticing (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/18. (DXD) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joseph Patrick McMonigle CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (McMonigle, Joseph) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joseph Patrick McMonigle CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (McMonigle, Joseph) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (approving #30 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2019. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (approving #29 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2019. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Request for Judicial Notice re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Maurice Sciammas and filed byMonolithic Power Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. and Maurice Sciammas' Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Related document(s) #31 ) (Snyder, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Maurice Sciammas and filed by Monolithic Power Systems Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/9/2019. Replies due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. and Maurice Sciammas Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Snyder, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jeffrey Alan Snyder CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (Snyder, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jeffrey Alan Snyder CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (Snyder, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019) (tshS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants at counter to plaintiff. (MSA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) states a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Doc. #6 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Doc. #8 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Request for Electronic Noticing (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/18. (DXD) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION (REQUEST) for Status by Kenneth Lenk. (LAD) (3 pages) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Kenneth Lenk. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (ATD) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to File In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth Lenk. (2 pages)(KAS) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-933-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees Or Costs (Long Form) by Kenneth Lenk. (HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Lenk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HLA) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P McMonigle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent S Brockelman