This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2020 at 06:40:34 (UTC).

Lenins v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Lenins filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Lenins

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander G Dwyer

Attorney at Kirkendall Dwyer LLP

4343 Sigma Rd., Ste. 200

Dallas, TX 75248

Andrew F Kirkendall

Attorney at Kirkendall Dwyer LLP

4343 Sigma Rd., Ste. 200

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant Attorney

Richard B North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough LLP (Atlanta)

201 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys Alexander Dwyer, Andrew Kirkendall, & Richard North, Jr. is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice.(Copy of Notice mailed to Alexander Dwyer, Andrew Kirkendall, and Richard North, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-04547. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#10

(#10) AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2017)

#6

(#6) *SUMMONS Submitted by Joseph Lenins. (Kirkendall, Andrew) *Document filed in wrong case. Modified on 1/24/2017 (LSP). [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2017)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Alexander G Dwyer on behalf of Joseph Lenins. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew F Kirkendall on behalf of Joseph Lenins. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX180140 filed by Joseph Lenins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase has been referred to Magistrate Judge Guyton for related case determination. (CAT) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys Alexander Dwyer, Andrew Kirkendall, & Richard North, Jr. is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice.(Copy of Notice mailed to Alexander Dwyer, Andrew Kirkendall, and Richard North, Jr.) (CAT) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-04547. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase Transferred to the Eastern District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *SUMMONS Submitted by Joseph Lenins. (Kirkendall, Andrew) *Document filed in wrong case. Modified on 1/24/2017 (LSP). [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 70, receipt number PHX180141 as to Andrew F Kirkendall, Alexander G Dwyer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Alexander G Dwyer on behalf of Joseph Lenins. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew F Kirkendall on behalf of Joseph Lenins. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-4547-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX180140 filed by Joseph Lenins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.