This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 07:43:56 (UTC).

LEMURIA, INC. v. WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 LEMURIA, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01278

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMURIA, INC.

Defendant

WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONATHAN WHEELER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN WHEELER PC

One Penn Ctr Suite 1270, 1617 Jfk Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

NICHOLAS FOPPIANO

Attorney at WHEELER DIULIO & BARNABEI, P.C.

1617 John F. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 1270

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

JONATHAN R. MACBRIDE

Attorney at ZELLE LLP

1635 Market Street, Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Arbitration Procedural Order 06/02/2022 Entered and copies e-mailed.(sah) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 8/16/2022 10:00 AM.(sah) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/31/22. 5/31/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#19

(#19) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#18

(#18) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(WHEELER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

17 #1

Consent

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by LEMURIA, INC... (WHEELER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER THAT THIS CIVIL ACTION IS REFERRED TO ARBITRATION SUBJECT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 53.2; FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY JUNE 27, 2022; THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS LETTER TO THE COURT BY JULY 1, 2022. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/12/22. 5/12/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPY TO ARB. (va) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LEMURIA, INC..(WHEELER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Designation Form

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporation, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company with Certificate of Service by WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice to State Court

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Arbitration Procedural Order 06/02/2022 Entered and copies e-mailed.(sah) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 8/16/2022 10:00 AM.(sah) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/31/22. 5/31/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(WHEELER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mcos, ) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by LEMURIA, INC... (WHEELER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER THAT THIS CIVIL ACTION IS REFERRED TO ARBITRATION SUBJECT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 53.2; FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY JUNE 27, 2022; THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS LETTER TO THE COURT BY JULY 1, 2022. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/12/22. 5/12/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPY TO ARB. (va) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/10/2022 02:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE.(amas) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(amas) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (WHEELER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/26/22 AT 2:30 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/18/22. 4/18/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket(#6) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (sg) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LEMURIA, INC.. (FOPPIANO, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LEMURIA, INC..(WHEELER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Designation Form)(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file Completed Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporation, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company with Certificate of Service by WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15831855), filed by WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Designation Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MACBRIDE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan R. MacBride