Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2020 at 12:23:31 (UTC).

LeMay v. Ethicon Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 LeMay filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr and Susie Morgan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00808

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol LeMay

Defendants

Boston Scientific Corporation

Ethicon Inc

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peyton Patrick Murphy

Attorney at Murphy Law Firm (Baton Rouge)

2354 South Acadian Thruway

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant Attorneys

Jon A. Strongman

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP (Kansas City)

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Amy L. McIntire

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Peter Joseph Rotolo, III

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

William M. Gage

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Ridgeland)

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400, P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

David B. Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP (Oxford)

1200 Jefferson Ave., Suite 205, P. O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Ridgeland)

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400, P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Court having been advised that all parties have firmly agreed upon a compromise in this matter; IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed as to all parties, without costs and without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary conference scheduled for Friday, April 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/22/2020.(sbs) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#35

(#35) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jon A. Strongman terminated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

34 #1

Proposed Order

#34

(#34) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Jon A. Strongman as Counsel of Record by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rotolo, Peter) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #31 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Carol LeMay. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/23/2020.(sbs) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

31 #1

Proposed Order

#31

(#31) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference by Carol LeMay, Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rotolo, Peter) Modified text, added filer on 3/20/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#30

(#30) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference be held by telephone on Wednesday, March 25, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The Court will provide all counsel with the call-in instructions necessary to participate in this conference via telephone. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/17/2020.(sbs) (Main Document 30 replaced on 3/18/2020 to correct day of conference) (tsf). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#28

(#28) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Peter Rotolo and Amy McIntire by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Peter Joseph Rotolo, III added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft).(Rotolo, Peter) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form, as more fully set forth herein; the plaintiff has 30 business days from the entry of this Order to pay Ethicon $500 as minimal partial compensation for the reasonable expenses caused by the plaintiff's failure to comply with discovery; plaintiff's counsel is directed to send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested, and file a copy of the receipt. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/30/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#7

(#7) REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #6 Memorandum In Opposition. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#6

(#7) REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #6 Memorandum In Opposition. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#5

(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form, as more fully set forth herein; the plaintiff has 30 business days from the entry of this Order to pay Ethicon $500 as minimal partial compensation for the reasonable expenses caused by the plaintiff's failure to comply with discovery; plaintiff's counsel is directed to send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested, and file a copy of the receipt. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/30/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#2

(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 167 (QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER)entered on 02/26/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3730526. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Court having been advised that all parties have firmly agreed upon a compromise in this matter; IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed as to all parties, without costs and without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary conference scheduled for Friday, April 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/22/2020.(sbs) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jon A. Strongman terminated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Jon A. Strongman as Counsel of Record by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rotolo, Peter) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #31 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Carol LeMay. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/23/2020.(sbs) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference by Carol LeMay, Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rotolo, Peter) Modified text, added filer on 3/20/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference be held by telephone on Wednesday, March 25, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The Court will provide all counsel with the call-in instructions necessary to participate in this conference via telephone. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/17/2020.(sbs) (Main Document 30 replaced on 3/18/2020 to correct day of conference) (tsf). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #28 Motion to Enroll Attorneys Peter J. Rotolo, III, and Amy L. McIntireas as Additional Counsel of Record for Boston Scientific Corporation. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Peter Rotolo and Amy McIntire by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Peter Joseph Rotolo, III added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft).(Rotolo, Peter) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-02413. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (dw) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Carol LeMay. (Murphy, Peyton) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Carol LeMay for Order on Motion For Sanction (Attachment: #1 Proof of Service)(Murphy, Peyton) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form, as more fully set forth herein; the plaintiff has 30 business days from the entry of this Order to pay Ethicon $500 as minimal partial compensation for the reasonable expenses caused by the plaintiff's failure to comply with discovery; plaintiff's counsel is directed to send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested, and file a copy of the receipt. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/30/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #6 Memorandum In Opposition. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM by Carol LeMay in opposition to #5 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form (Murphy, Peyton) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 167 (QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER)entered on 02/26/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3730526. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/9/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peyton Patrick Murphy