This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2020 at 09:14:29 (UTC).

Lemaster v. LexisNexis Risk Data Management Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Lemaster filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LexisNexis Risk Data Management Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05097

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alyssa Lemaster

Defendants

LexisNexis Risk Data Management Inc.

RP On-Site LLC

LexisNexis Risk Data Retrieval Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Lawrence Hilton

Attorney at Hilton Parker

10400 Blacklick-Eastern Rd Nw, Suite 110

Pickerington, OH 43147

Patrick W Skilliter

Attorney at Legal Aid Society of Columbus

1108 City Park Ave., Suite 100

Columbus, OH 43206

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/15/2020. by Plaintiff Alyssa Lemaster. (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to LexisNexis Risk Data Management Inc., RP On-Site LLC. (mdr) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve by certified mail upon Defendants asummons, a copy of the Complaint, and a copy of this Order. Defendants are ORDERED to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS after being served with a copy of the Complaint and summons.Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 09/29/2020. (mdr) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit Application to Proceed IFP

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alyssa Lemaster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to Proceed IFP) (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

1 #3

Summons Form

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alyssa Lemaster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants. Answer due 12/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/24/2020. (EPD) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/15/2020. by Plaintiff Alyssa Lemaster. (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to LexisNexis Risk Data Management Inc., RP On-Site LLC. (mdr) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve by certified mail upon Defendants asummons, a copy of the Complaint, and a copy of this Order. Defendants are ORDERED to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS after being served with a copy of the Complaint and summons.Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 09/29/2020. (mdr) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alyssa Lemaster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to Proceed IFP) (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alyssa Lemaster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP On-Site LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEISINT, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where LexisNexis Risk Data Retrieval Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Lawrence Hilton