This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2020 at 09:01:09 (UTC).

Lekuntwane v. Help at Home CT, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 Lekuntwane filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Help at Home CT, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00386

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kefilwe Lekuntwane

Defendants

Help at Home CT, LLC

Mary Ann Ciambriello

Homecare Connections, LLC

Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nitor V. Egbarin

Attorney at Law Office of Nitor V. Egbarin, LLC

100 Pearl Street 14Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Richard Eugene Hayber

Attorney at Hayber, McKenna & Dinsemore, LLC

750 Main Street, Suite 904

Hartford, CT 06103

Michael T. Petela, Jr

Attorney at Hayber, McKenna & Dinsmore, LLC

900 Chapel Street, Ste Floor 11

New Haven, CT 06510

Defendant Attorneys

Craig Thomas Dickinson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.- NH, CT

One Century Tower, Suite 300, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

Maura Mastrony

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

One Century Tower, 265 Church Street, Suite 300

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Affidavit

#17

#16

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Attorney(s) Ira D.Wincott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5867773) by Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC, Mary Ann Ciambriello, Help at Home CT, LLC, Homecare Connections, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mastrony, Maura) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Mary Ann Cambriello, for herself and as agent for Alzheimer's & Dementia Care, LLC on 05/03/2020, filed by Kefilwe Lekuntwane. (Petela, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Jeffrey Wesikowski for Help at Home Care, LLC, and Homecare Connections on 4/22/2020, filed by Kefilwe Lekuntwane. (Petela, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC to 6/23/2020; Mary Ann Ciambriello to 6/23/2020; Help at Home CT, LLC to 6/23/2020; Homecare Connections, LLC to 6/23/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to 6/23/2020 to file a responsive pleading or motion directed to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/13/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Thomas Dickinson on behalf of Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC, Mary Ann Ciambriello, Help at Home CT, LLC, Homecare Connections, LLC (Dickinson, Craig) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time until June 23, 2020 to file a responsive pleading or motion directed to Plaintiffs Complaint by Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC, Mary Ann Ciambriello, Help at Home CT, LLC, Homecare Connections, LLC. (Mastrony, Maura) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Mastrony on behalf of Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC, Mary Ann Ciambriello, Help at Home CT, LLC, Homecare Connections, LLC Revised (Mastrony, Maura) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Mastrony on behalf of Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC, Mary Ann Ciambriello, Help at Home CT, LLC, Homecare Connections, LLC (Mastrony, Maura) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Petela, Jr on behalf of Kefilwe Lekuntwane (Petela, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC, Mary Ann Ciambriello, Help at Home CT, LLC, Homecare Connections, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Eugene Hayber* *Hayber, McKenna & Dinsemore, LLC* *750 Main Street, Suite 904* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alzheimer's and Dementia Care, LLC, Mary Ann Ciambriello, Help at Home CT, LLC, Homecare Connections, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Eugene Hayber* *Hayber, McKenna & Dinsemore, LLC* *750 Main Street, Suite 904* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Kefilwe Lekuntwane, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing Order For Fair Labor Standards Act Cases Not Pleaded as Collective Actions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/23/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/23/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/23/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2020. Discovery due by 9/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Collective and Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5764633.), filed by Kefilwe Lekuntwane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Help at Home, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nitor V. Egbarin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T Petela, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Eugene Hayber