This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 12:59:58 (UTC).

Leja v. Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Leja filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Brousseau Management Co , L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin Wilder-Doomes and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00269

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Leja, Jr.

Thomas Davis

Defendants

Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C.

Monet Manor, L.L.C.

Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C.

4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C.

Brousseau Properties, L.L.C.

Brian D. Brousseau

669 Monet Drive, L.L.C.

964 Maximillian, L.L.C.

402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C.

31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C.

Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Scott Parmet

Attorney at Parmet PC

800 Sawyer St.

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Interrogatories by Robert Leja, Jr.(Parmet, Matthew) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Leja, Jr, Thomas Davis. All Defendants. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Objection of Defendants' Time to Plead Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a) by Thomas Davis, Robert Leja, Jr (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit B - Consent

4 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

#4

(#4) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Leja, Jr, Thomas Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#3

(#3) LIMITED SCHEDULING ORDER (Fair Labor Standards Act): Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, the Court finds it necessary to implement a schedule tailored to meet the particular circumstances of this case which is based on the Fair Labor Standards Act. Therefore, consistent with the requirements for just, speedy and inexpensive administration of justice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED that the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Local Civil Rule 26 concerning initial disclosures are hereby WAIVED in this case. Instead, the parties shall comply with the following schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/9/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C., 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C., 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C., 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C., 964 Maximillian, L.L.C., Brian D. Brousseau, Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C., Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C., Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C., Brousseau Properties, L.L.C., Monet Manor, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

1 #13

Attachment Summons on Brian D. Brousseau

1 #12

Attachment Summons on 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C.

1 #11

Attachment Summons on 964 Maximillian, L.L.C.

1 #10

Attachment Summons on 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C.

1 #9

Attachment Summons on 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C.

1 #8

Attachment Summons on 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C.

1 #7

Attachment Summons on Monet Manor, L.L.C.

1 #6

Attachment Summons on Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C.

1 #5

Attachment Summons on Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C.

1 #4

Attachment Summons on Brousseau Properties, L.L.C.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Interrogatories by Robert Leja, Jr.(Parmet, Matthew) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Leja, Jr, Thomas Davis. All Defendants. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Objection of Defendants' Time to Plead Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a) by Thomas Davis, Robert Leja, Jr (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Leja, Jr, Thomas Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LIMITED SCHEDULING ORDER (Fair Labor Standards Act): Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, the Court finds it necessary to implement a schedule tailored to meet the particular circumstances of this case which is based on the Fair Labor Standards Act. Therefore, consistent with the requirements for just, speedy and inexpensive administration of justice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED that the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Local Civil Rule 26 concerning initial disclosures are hereby WAIVED in this case. Instead, the parties shall comply with the following schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/9/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C., 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C., 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C., 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C., 964 Maximillian, L.L.C., Brian D. Brousseau, Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C., Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C., Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C., Brousseau Properties, L.L.C., Monet Manor, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935649.), filed by Robert Leja, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons on Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C., #4 Attachment Summons on Brousseau Properties, L.L.C., #5 Attachment Summons on Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C., #6 Attachment Summons on Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C., #7 Attachment Summons on Monet Manor, L.L.C., #8 Attachment Summons on 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C., #9 Attachment Summons on 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C., #10 Attachment Summons on 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C., #11 Attachment Summons on 964 Maximillian, L.L.C., #12 Attachment Summons on 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C., #13 Attachment Summons on Brian D. Brousseau)(Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.