This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2019 at 08:00:16 (UTC).

LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC v. MORRIS INVEST, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against MORRIS INVEST, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02662

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendants

CLAYTON MORRIS

MORRIS INVEST, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Piatt

Attorney at RILEY WILLIAMS & PIATT, LLC

301 Massachusetts Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Anne Medlin Lowe

Attorney at RILEY WILLIAMS & PIATT, LLC

301 Massachusetts Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Molly Elizabeth Harkins

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Amanda L.B. Mulroony

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

David J. Hensel

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC . (Piatt, James) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/9/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Waiver of Service and Agreed Response Deadline, filed by Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC (Hensel, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Hensel, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hensel on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Hensel, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Elizabeth Harkins on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Harkins, Molly) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L.B. Mulroony on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Mulroony, Amanda) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to CLAYTON MORRIS and MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (DJH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Lowe, Anne) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Medlin Lowe on behalf of Plaintiff LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Lowe, Anne) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James Piatt on behalf of Plaintiff LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Piatt, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC, filed by LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5504466) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Piatt, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC . (Piatt, James) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/9/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Waiver of Service and Agreed Response Deadline, filed by Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC (Hensel, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Hensel, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hensel on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Hensel, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Elizabeth Harkins on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Harkins, Molly) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L.B. Mulroony on behalf of Defendants CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (Mulroony, Amanda) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to CLAYTON MORRIS and MORRIS INVEST, LLC. (DJH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Lowe, Anne) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Medlin Lowe on behalf of Plaintiff LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Lowe, Anne) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James Piatt on behalf of Plaintiff LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Piatt, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC, filed by LEJ MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5504466) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Piatt, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORRIS INVEST, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Piatt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne Medlin Lowe