This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 07:42:04 (UTC).

LEIVA CONTRACTOR LLC v. SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 LEIVA CONTRACTOR LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03474

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEIVA CONTRACTOR LLC

Defendant

SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OREST BEZPALKO, II

Attorney at BEZPALKO & ASSOCIATES PC

Two Penn Center, Suite 1516, 1500 John F. Kennedy Boulevard

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

GAVIN FUNG

Attorney at Kennedys

1600 Market Street, Suite 1410

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #3

Certificate of Service

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

2 #1

Arbitration Certification Form

2 #2

Main Document

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER THAT DISCOVERY WILL BE SERVED, NOTICED AND COMPLETED BY 1/31/22. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 2/15/22. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 2/22/22. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED IN THE TRIAL POOL ON 3/1/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/2/21. 9/2/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III Status Conference held on 9/2/21. (JL ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Response to Court Order dated 08/12/2021 re #6 Order, Member Status by LEIVA CONTRACTOR LLC. (BEZPALKO, OREST) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket(#9) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/1/2021 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. THIS PROCEEDING IS RESCHEDULED FROM 8/23/2021. REFER TO DOC. 7 FOR ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION.(km, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/23/2021 01:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF LEIVA CONTRACTORS LLC SHALL FILE A DECLARATION, ON OR BEFORE 8/23/21, WHICH SETS FORTH THE NAMES AND CITIZENSHIP OF ALL ITS MEMBERS AT THE TIME THE LAWSUIT WAS FILED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/12/21. 8/12/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (FUNG, GAVIN) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Seneca Insurance Company Inc., a New York Corporation is wholly-owned by the North River Insurance Company, a New Jersey corporation which is wholly owned by United States Fire Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation which is wholly owned by Crum & Forster Holdings Corp. a Delaware Corporation which is wholly owned by Fairfax (US) Inc., a Delaware corporation which is substantially owned by FFHL Group Ltd, a Canadian Company which is wholly owned by Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, a Canadian public company with Certificate of Service by SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(FUNG, GAVIN) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(FUNG, GAVIN) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15315707), filed by SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Designation Form)(FUNG, GAVIN) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gavin Fung Esq.