This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:40:33 (UTC).

Leiss v. DeMarois et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Leiss filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against DeMarois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karin J. Immergut. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karin J. Immergut

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curtis B. Leiss

Oregon City, OR 97045

Defendants

Micah Christensen

Jessica M. DeMarois

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 01/14/2020.) (rs) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (rs) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (rs) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. IFP Pending Filed by Curtis B. Leiss against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2020: #2 Exhibit) (rs). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (rs) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 01/14/2020.) (rs) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (rs) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (rs) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. IFP Pending Filed by Curtis B. Leiss against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2020: #2 Exhibit) (rs). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.