This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2021 at 13:03:53 (UTC).

Leisinger et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Leisinger filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00318

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eldon Leisinger

Beverly Leisinger

Defendants

Wright Medical Group Inc

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danielle Gold

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg

700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Defendant Attorneys

Sean K. Burke

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

505 9Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-2166

Anne A. Gruner

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wright Medical Group Inc by Eldon Leisinger, Beverly Leisinger. (Gold, Danielle) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wright Medical Technology Inc by Eldon Leisinger, Beverly Leisinger. (Gold, Danielle) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean K. Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne A. Gruner on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Gruner, Anne) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/14/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc, filed by Eldon Leisinger, Beverly Leisinger. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081745.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean K. Burke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne A. Gruner