This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:02:02 (UTC).

Leif v. Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Leif filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10085

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Leif

Defendant

Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan T. Macedo

Attorney at Murray Law Office

2 Granite Ave., Suite 420

Milton, MA 02186

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin P. Daly

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Patrick W. Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

1055 Washington Boulevard

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Weyland, Loren) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Daly on behalf of Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company (Daly, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W. Begos on behalf of Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Leif. Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Macedo, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Leif. Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Macedo, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W. Begos on behalf of Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Daly on behalf of Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company (Daly, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Weyland, Loren) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number BMADC-9147900 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lisa Leif. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Macedo, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Walter Begos