This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 08:57:36 (UTC).

Leichty v. Houser

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Leichty filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Houser. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Singleton, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00283

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Singleton, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Thomas F. Leichty

Wasilla, AK 99623

Thomas F. Martin

Wasilla, AK 99623

Respondent

Earl L. Houser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Michal G. Stryszak

State Of Alaska, Department Of Law (Anch - Suite 200), Office Of The Attorney General, Civil Division, 1031 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michal G. Stryszak on behalf of Earl L. Houser (Stryszak, Michal) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paurpris. Notice of appearance due within 14 days of this Order. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/26/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

6 #1

Account Statement

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas F. Leichty. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Thomas F. Leichty. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/8/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

(#4) **DISREGARD ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/8/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/8/2019 to clarify text, incorrect pdf attached and regenerate NEF (SDW, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thomas F. Leichty.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254, filed by Thomas F. Leichty.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michal G. Stryszak on behalf of Earl L. Houser (Stryszak, Michal) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paurpris. Notice of appearance due within 14 days of this Order. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/26/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas F. Leichty. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Thomas F. Leichty. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/8/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) **DISREGARD ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 11/8/2019. (SDW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/8/2019 to clarify text, incorrect pdf attached and regenerate NEF (SDW, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Thomas F. Leichty. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thomas F. Leichty.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254, filed by Thomas F. Leichty.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less