This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2020 at 09:46:27 (UTC).

Lehigh Gas Wholesale Services, Inc. v. Universal Property Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 Lehigh Gas Wholesale Services, Inc filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Universal Property Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Klindt and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00331

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Klindt

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC.

Universal Property Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mya M. Hatchette

Attorney at Winderweedle, Haines, Ward & Woodman, PA

329 Park Ave N Fl 2, Po Box 880

Winter Park, FL 32790-0880

Brandon Scott DeGel

Attorney at Winderweedle, Haines, Ward & Woodman, PA

329 Park Ave N Fl 2, Po Box 880

Winter Park, FL 32790-0880

Meredith M. Haynes

Attorney at Williams Mullen

200 South 10Th Street, Suite 1600

Richmond, VA 23219

Otto W. Konrad

Attorney at Williams Mullen

200 South 10Th Street, Suite 1600

Richmond, VA 23219

Brendan D. O'Toole

Attorney at Wiliams Mullen

200 South 10Th Street, Suite 1600

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Einbinder

Attorney at Einbinder & Dunn, LLP

112 Madison Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Mackenzie L. Dimitri

Attorney at Einbinder & Dunn LLP

112 Madison Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Michael Kean

Attorney at Loren & Kean Law

7111 Fairway Drive, Suite 302

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

 

Court Documents

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

#25

#24

#23

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

4 #3

Exhibit C

1 #7

State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint - Exhibit B

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT State Court Summons - Exhibit A

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel. cindyrprfcrr@gmail.com (CLP) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing via Videoconference held on April 28, 2020 before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Packevicz Jarriel,Telephone number 904-301-6843; cindyrprfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 5/26/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2020. (CLP) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting the remaining portion of #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This case is remanded. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transmit a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk, Fourth Judicial Circuit, and close this file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/29/2020. (JW) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: MOTION HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE held on 4/28/2020. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF HEARING on #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorneys' Fees. Hearing set for 4/28/2020 at 02:45 PM before Judge Marcia Morales Howard, at which time the Court will pronounce ruling on the remaining issue raised in this motion. The hearing will be held by video teleconferencing using Zoom. See Notice for additional details. (JW) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: MOTION HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE held on 4/23/2020; denying #6 Defendant's Motion to Permit Removal of Related Pending Actions to This Matter, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Consolidate Related Actions to This Matter Once Removed, Request for Expedited Briefing and Consideration, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law; denying in part and taking under advisement in part #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorneys' Fees. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and Written Designation and Consent to Act. Michael Einbinder and Mackenzie L. Dimitri are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant with Michael I. Kean as local counsel. Mr. Einbinder and Ms. Dimitri shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/22/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #13 and #15 Motions for Admission of Brendan D. O'Toole and Otto W. Konrad Pro Hac Vice and Written Designations and Consents to Act. Brendan D. O'Toole and Otto W. Konrad are permitted to appear pro hac vic on behalf of Plaintiff with Mya M. Hatchette and Brandon S. DeGel as local counsel. Mr. O'Toole and Mr. Konrad shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/22/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in support re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Reply Supporting Its Motion to Remand)(Hatchette, Mya) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael Binbinder and Mackenzie Dmitri, appearing on behalf of UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC. (Filing fee $300 receipt number JAX032980.) Related document: #14 MOTION for Michael Einbinder, Esq. and Mackenzie L. Dmitri, Esq. to appear pro hac vice . (KKH) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Permit Removal or Related Pending Actions to this Matter or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Consolidate Related Actions to this Matter Once Removed, Request for Expedited Briefing and Consideration filed by LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. (Hatchette, Mya) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorneys' Fees and Expedited Briefing Schedule by LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hatchette, Mya) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint by UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC..(Kean, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to #6 Defendant, Universal Property Services Inc.'s Motion to Permit Removal of Related Pending Actions to this Matter, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Consolidate Related Actions to this Matter Once Removed, Request for Expedited Briefing and Consideration, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, no later than 5:00 p.m. on April 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/6/2020. (MAM) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Permit Removal or Related Pending Actions to this Matter or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Consolidate Related Actions to this Matter Once Removed, Request for Expedited Briefing and Consideration, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kean, Michael) Modified on 4/6/2020 to edit text (PAM). (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to counsel Michael Einbinder and Mackenzie L. Dimitri of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT for Eviction against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC. filed by LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(PAM) Originally filed in state court on 3/12/20 (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-331-J-34JRK. (SJB) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court in and for Duval County, case number 16-2020-CC-003385-XXXX-MA filed in State Court on March 12, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16654492 filed by UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Summons - Exhibit A, #2 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint - Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #7 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket)(Kean, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mya M. Hatchette

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan David O'Toole