This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 09:22:23 (UTC).

Legrier v. Tuma

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Legrier filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tuma. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02216

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reginald Legrier

Defendant

Robert Tuma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Andrew Nace

Attorney at Paulson and Nace PLLC

1025 Thomas Jefferson Street Nw, Suite 810

Washington, DC 20007

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Anne Proctor

Attorney at Progressive House Counsel

11350 Mccormick Road, Suite 601, Executive Plaza Ii

Hunt Valley, MD 21031

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/25/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/11/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER Rescinding #9 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/11/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Robert Tuma.(Proctor, Melissa) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#9

(#9) (RESCINDED) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/10/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/11/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Robert Tuma Statement of Case (Proctor, Melissa) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Robert Tuma (Proctor, Melissa) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#6

(#6) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/30/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

5 #1

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Robert Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of filing of state court discovery material. (Attachments: #1 First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Robert Tuma)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Robert Tuma.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Robert Tuma filed by Reginald Legrier. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20-002610 MT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637123997) filed by Robert Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/25/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/11/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Rescinding #9 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/11/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Robert Tuma.(Proctor, Melissa) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (RESCINDED) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/10/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/11/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Robert Tuma Statement of Case (Proctor, Melissa) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Robert Tuma (Proctor, Melissa) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/30/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Robert Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of filing of state court discovery material. (Attachments: #1 First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Robert Tuma)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Robert Tuma.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Robert Tuma filed by Reginald Legrier. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20-002610 MT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637123997) filed by Robert Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less