This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 07:55:13 (UTC).

Legerski v. Milbank Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Legerski filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Milbank Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02995

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Floyd Legerski

Defendant

Milbank Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Graham Burchard, II

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Larry E. Bache, Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Christine Marie Kroupa

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

John M. Palmeri

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Nicole Kim Griffard

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set January 21, 2020 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/21/19. (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2995-RBJ (angar, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#18

(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Milbank Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Auto Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate State Auto Insurance Group for Milbank Insurance Company. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Milbank Insurance Company.(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Graham Burchard, II on behalf of Floyd LegerskiAttorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party Floyd Legerski(pty:pla) (Burchard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Floyd LegerskiAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Floyd Legerski(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Floyd LegerskiAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Floyd Legerski(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint upon Milbank Insurance Company on 09/30/2019. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#4

(#16) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Milbank Insurance Company.(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #6

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

State Court Summons and Affidavit of Service

1 #3

State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Milbank Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019-CV-32292. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6954576), filed by Milbank Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Summons and Affidavit of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • (#22) MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/20/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/4/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set January 21, 2020 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/21/19. (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2995-RBJ (angar, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02995-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Milbank Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Auto Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate State Auto Insurance Group for Milbank Insurance Company. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Milbank Insurance Company.(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Graham Burchard, II on behalf of Floyd LegerskiAttorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party Floyd Legerski(pty:pla) (Burchard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Floyd LegerskiAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Floyd Legerski(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Floyd LegerskiAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Floyd Legerski(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicole Kim Griffard on behalf of Milbank Insurance CompanyAttorney Nicole Kim Griffard added to party Milbank Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Griffard, Nicole) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Palmeri on behalf of Milbank Insurance CompanyAttorney John M. Palmeri added to party Milbank Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Palmeri, John) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #7 Order to Jonathan E. Bukowski, Larry E. Bache, and Timothy G. Burchard, II at MERLIN LAW GROUP, P.A., 1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 1150, Denver, Colorado 80202. Text Only Entry (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/23/2019. Consent Form due by 1/7/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint upon Milbank Insurance Company on 09/30/2019. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Milbank Insurance Company, filed by Floyd Legerski.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Milbank Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019-CV-32292. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6954576), filed by Milbank Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Summons and Affidavit of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less