This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 08:28:17 (UTC).

Legendre v. Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Legendre filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01767

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Joseph Legendre

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Cross Claimants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Eagle Inc.

Foster-Wheeler LLC

Paramount Global

Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.

Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.

Avondale Industries, Inc.

Avondale Shipyards, Inc

Avondale Marine Ways, Inc.

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc.

Amchem Products, Inc.

Benjamin Foster Co

Foster Wheeler Corporation

General Electric Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

ViacomCBS Inc

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Eagle Inc.

Foster-Wheeler LLC

Paramount Global

Amchem Products, Inc.

Benjamin Foster Co

Foster Wheeler Corporation

General Electric Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

ViacomCBS Inc

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerolyn Petit Roussel

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Benjamin Peter Dinehart

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Jonathan Brett Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Lauren Roussel Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alison A. Spindler

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daphne M. Lancaster

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brian C. Bossier

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christopher Thomas Grace, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

April Ann McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Susan Beth Kohn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Stephanie B. Laborde

Attorney at Lafleur & Laborde, LLC

6160 Perkins Road, Suite 225

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Benjamin M. Chapman

Attorney at Lafleur & Laborde, LLC

6160 Perkins Road, Suite 225

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

April Ann McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Susan Beth Kohn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Paramount Global.(Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#56

(#56) ORDER granting #55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daphne M. Lancaster terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/10/2022. (lw) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

55 #1

Proposed Order

55 #55

Main Document

#54

(#54) ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint by Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 8/9/2022 (cwa). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#53

(#53) ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint by International Paper Company, International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#52

(#52) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#51

(#51) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Uniroyal, Inc. served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#40

(#53) ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint by International Paper Company, International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Paramount Global.(Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER granting #55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daphne M. Lancaster terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/10/2022. (lw) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Daphne M. Lancaster as Attorney by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint by Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 8/9/2022 (cwa). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint by International Paper Company, International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Uniroyal, Inc. served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022. (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) SUMMONS Returned Executed; International Paper Company served on 6/23/2022, answer due 7/14/2022. (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) SUMMONS Returned Executed; General Electric Company served on 6/21/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. (Melancon, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Brian C. Bossier, Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III, Christopher Thomas Grace, III, Erin Helen Boyd, Laura M. Gillen for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/17/2022. (lw) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Bayer Cropscience Inc., Eagle Inc., Foster-Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Paramount Global, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(lw) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer Cropscience Inc., Eagle Inc., Foster-Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Paramount Global, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #5 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 6/17/2022 (lw). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zurich American Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Bayer Cropscience Inc., Eagle Inc., Foster-Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc., International Paper Company, Paramount Global, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc. by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 6/17/2022 (lw). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Brian C. Bossier, Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III, Christopher T. Grace, III, Erin H. Boyd, and Laura M. Gillen. The case caption of all future filings should remain as pleadings were captioned in state court. (lw) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Brian C. Bossier, Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III, Christopher T. Grace, III, Erin H. Boyd, and Laura M. Gillen by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2022-03972, F-14 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9401767) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 6/15/2022 (lw). (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENJAMIN FOSTER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc. is a litigant