Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:01:54 (UTC).

Legendary Structures, Inc. v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Legendary Structures, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10026

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Legendary Structures, Inc.

Defendants

Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Surjit P Soni

Attorney at The Soni Law Firm

116 South Euclid Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101

Leo Edward Lundberg, Jr

Attorney at The Soni Law Firm

116 South Euclid Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101

Michael Danton Richardson

Attorney at The Soni Law Firm

116 South Euclid Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101

Michael A Long

Attorney at The Soni Law Firm

116 South Euclid Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorneys

Ted A Smith

Attorney at Johnston Smith ALC

1050 Northgate Drive Suite 510

San Rafael, CA 94903

Ann Kathryn Johnston

Attorney at Johnston Smith ALC

1050 Northgate Drive Suite 510

San Rafael, CA 94903

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court schedules a Scheduling Conference for 1/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/15/2021. (vcr) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Ted) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ted A Smith counsel for Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. Adding Ann K. Johnston as counsel of record for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Smith, Ted) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Smith, Ted) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10026-SB (JEMx). (aco) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Navigators Specialty Insurance Company answer now due 12/16/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney Ted A Smith added to party Navigators Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Ted) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc., upon Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, authorized agent to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (car) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc.. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc., identifying LEGENDARY BUILDERS CORP. & THE STITCH FAMILY TRUST. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc.. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28798434 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc.. (Attorney Surjit P Soni added to party Legendary Structures, Inc.(pty:pla))(Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court schedules a Scheduling Conference for 1/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/15/2021. (vcr) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Ted) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ted A Smith counsel for Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. Adding Ann K. Johnston as counsel of record for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Smith, Ted) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Smith, Ted) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10026-SB (JEMx). (aco) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Navigators Specialty Insurance Company answer now due 12/16/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney Ted A Smith added to party Navigators Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Ted) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc., upon Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, authorized agent to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (car) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc.. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc., identifying LEGENDARY BUILDERS CORP. & THE STITCH FAMILY TRUST. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc.. (Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28798434 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc.. (Attorney Surjit P Soni added to party Legendary Structures, Inc.(pty:pla))(Soni, Surjit) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGENDARY STRUCTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant