This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2021 at 08:29:05 (UTC).

Legend Pictures, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Legend Pictures, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03200

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Legend Pictures, LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

29Supreme

49Supreme

aaddggtt1122

aahhggtt200

abbialkk

ABCDOR

ABFNJBRF

ADHJNJVA

AILIBOTE

airzl

Akiclia

ALAYMO

Alva Nahum

ALXXADUY

AMY FARRAH HOLDINGS COMPANY LIMITED132

AMY HALL

AmyAShields

Andani121

182 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

111 West Jackson Blvdsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevardsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

111 West Jackson Boulevardsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevardsuite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#30

19 #4

Exhibit 3, Part 4

19 #2

Exhibit 3, Part 2

#17

12 #20

Exhibit 3, Part 20

12 #17

Exhibit 3, Part 17

12 #13

Exhibit 3, Part 13

12 #9

Exhibit 3, Part 9

12 #7

Exhibit 3, Part 7

#6

#5

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: EMeiShanShiHaoXiangJiXieGongChengYouXianGongSi, Enea A Pacn, enxiangxij, ErChangBaiHuoXiaoShouDian, Erinuses, Estoiles F, Eternal noble, Ethan Alleyne, Eugene L Colunga, Evenvia, ewrwerhgrdf, FACIAL TOP ONE, FANGUOXIA, fashion 1938, Fatigate, FAZHA, fdaslj, fdbfgs, fdhggfdhfghfgh, feiyumaoyi15, Felicia D Re, Femitersforward, feng shuying, fengcaimaoyi, fenyanmaoyi, FIDEFUTURE, Finken Technology Co.Limited, FNCPPI, fopjOJGN148, ftmjkoiu, fuwen939541, fuyushangmao15, fxfgfzgfzh, GANCG, gangchenbao, gaojiemuye, gaomishiliyilinbaihuobianlidian, gaomishiwangrongxiriyongpinbaihuobu and GAOYANAN added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: CZHFEN, Daguang department store, DaiJS, DAIYUZANGHUA, DANIELLE THOMSON, Dar J Ceav, dawamengmenghua, DayDayBaoDan, DAZONGSHI, dddddddddddddfsffdsfdssdf, Dean BVigil, DEMISSHOP, DengXiongShop, dexingrixinbaihuoyouxiangongsi, dfgdf121, dgfsdfg40, DGGEUER OTEPUWETPEI, DGSJH, Ding Yuping, Divade, diy girl, DIYDiamondPainting, DLTYXME6, DOGUOX, Dongshun toys, DONGYUBO, DorothyTAddison, Dortmundo, DouShi, DRAKE PETER, DressYourHome Inc, drgyhnj, drumbeat, dsfbsesdf, dsgsegregreh, duiruijiadian, DUTELON, DXHDGOD, DYCZSC, Easy cat, ECNM56B888, EddieCNash, edg5s54g121, ElizabethJBroadwell and Elton L Entrekin added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: beiyouguohao, BELOVING STORE CYAN, Beosh, BFBCD, BGDRpl, BGFJVFR, BIAFUQIA, bifuyimaoyi, binhaixiandanengdianzikejiyouxiangongsi, bionogk, BirdieJLarson, BIXIXN, Bizhu Department, Blanketljfe, Bouianw, BPZQNKDSW, bribase, Butalways, CAFO., Cai Xueqin E-commerce Services, caise store, Caisheng toys, Camry store, CAOYONG, Carl Artbay Lighting, Carry Kim, Casady, CCBRA, chang zhi shiwangqihuishangmaoyouxiangongsi, changzhishifujiguangshangmaoyouxiangongsi, changzhishijiarongchenshangmaoyouxiangongsi, Chanl Songtao, charmbit, Chen Lin International Art Deco, Chenggao Trading, chengyaomaoyi, chen-lin, CHENRONGSHENG, chenzhiteng, Chongqing Yangjun, ChongYangXianXiuXiongBaiHuoDian, ChrisELong, CHrome Wing, chuanmoruibaihuoshangmaodianpan, Clifton C Earnhardt, COGOLINK TECHNOLOGY LIMITED, colorful8, Comfortersain, congzhoupoanwangluo, Coolwayer, COREY WESTON, Corina R Rodriguez, Courtneyteeco, Crazy dog, creamdealAZ, creamrinhz, Crese halo, Curnageing Coolwayer and Curt J Basile added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: 29Supreme, 49Supreme, aaddggtt1122, aahhggtt200, abbialkk, ABCDOR, ABFNJBRF, ADHJNJVA, AILIBOTE, airzl, Akiclia, ALAYMO, Alva Nahum, ALXXADUY, AMY FARRAH HOLDINGS COMPANY LIMITED132, AMY HALL, AmyAShields, Andani121, Andy Blanket, ANHTIPONNIO, Anhur furniture, Anitrnmailey, Anjifeng, AnQiuShiWangAnDianZi, Anticlea, anzikeji, aomiguojimaoyi, aoxincu, apojdsn, Aqemej, Arte rilassata, Artwork stop, asdggf5245, asdpihnk, AustinDFelix, Autismcounting, Autumn121, AUYTNooP, BAIBHUA, baiganZCFZBD, Baihui Firm, baijixinjianzhuzhuangshigongcheng, baiminhui658741, baiquanxianminghaobaihuoshangdian, baisazhinengkeji, baishengshangmao1, BAISI INDUSTRIAL CO., LIMITED, baizhanping, BallZY, Bao Anle, bao-bao, baodijiancaijingxiaobu, baotamajiawanchengyikunbocaimiantiebanyouyutiegu, bathsxx towelsxx, Beancurdstopsp, beideshihuachanpin and BeiJingLaTeErKeJiYouXianGongSi added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/2/2021. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic motion hearing held on 8/2/2021. Defendants do not appear. Plaintiff confirms that Defendants were served by both email and electronic publication. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #24 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal: Schedule A to the Complaint #2 ; Plaintiff's motion for entry of a temporary restraining order #10 ; Exhibit 3 to the declaration of Kristina Holliman #12 ; First Amended Schedule A to Amended Complaint #17 ; Plaintiff's renewed motion for entry of a temporary restraining order #18 ; Amended exhibit 3 to the declaration of Kristina Holliman #19 ; and the Temporary Restraining Order entered on 7/19/2021 #23 . JiangIP LLC and Keith Vogt, Ltd. are ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.courts.com/instructions. Plaintiff will file any motion for default judgment by 9/2/2021 and should notice the motion for hearing on 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM. Telephonic status hearing set for 9/6/2021 at 10:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Legend Pictures, LLC. (aee, ) (Document not scanned). Modified on 7/28/2021 (aee, ). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Legend Pictures, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #24 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/2/2021 at 10:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM by Legend Pictures, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Keith Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Legend Pictures, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Legend Pictures, LLC for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Legend Pictures, LLC by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Legend Pictures, LLC by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Legend Pictures, LLC by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Legend Pictures, LLC by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULE A to Complaint by Plaintiff Legend Pictures, LLC (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 8/4/2021 (kl, ). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Legend Pictures, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18354171. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Legend Pictures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Grodman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yi Bu