This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 07:42:12 (UTC).

Legacy Partners Inc. et al v. EPMI et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Legacy Partners Inc filed an Other lawsuit against EPMI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-MC-80037

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Addie Smith

Defendants and Petitioners

Legacy Partners Inc.

Christina Jones

Michael Holt

Glen Ceridono

Syres Properties

Joseph Syufy

Syufy Enterprises, LP

Sywest Development

Syhadley, LLC

Respondent

EPMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Benjamin Alexander Mains

Kathryn Paige Fletcher

Thomas Michael McInerney

Respondent Attorney

Dylan B. Carp

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Declaration

7 #7

Main Document

6 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service Attorneys for EPMI

6 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service Addie Smith

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Partners Inc. re #1 MOTION for Hearing, 2 Case Assigned by Intake, #3 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Attorneys for EPMI (Mains, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Partners Inc. re #1 MOTION for Hearing, 2 Case Assigned by Intake, #3 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Addie Smith (Mains, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#3

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Partners Inc. re #1 MOTION for Hearing, 2 Case Assigned by Intake, #3 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Attorneys for EPMI (Mains, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

1 #14

Notice of Pendency of Related Action

1 #13

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #12

Certification of Interested Parties

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit E to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher

1 #5

Exhibit D to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher

1 #3

Exhibit B to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher

1 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher

1 #1

Main Document

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #1 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum against EPMI. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held and recorded by Zoom videoconference on 3/17/2022 re #1 Legacy Partners Inc.'s Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum against EPMI. Pro Se Plaintiff Addie Smith did not appear this date. The Court will issue an order. (Digital Recording Time: 11-05-11:09) Attorney for Legacy: Kathy FletcherAttorney for EPMI: Dylan Carp (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#22) AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The hearing on Legacy Partners Inc.'s Motion to Compel set for 3/17/2022 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 16, 2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 3/8/2022 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#21) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The hearing on Legacy Partners Inc.'s Motion to Compel set for 3/17/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 16, 2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. The re is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION for Hearing. Motion Hearing reset for 3/17/2022 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING BY ONE WEEK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/7/2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Continue ) filed byLegacy Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kathryn Fletcher, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fletcher, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Addie Smith re #16 MOTION for Continuance (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Declaration of Addie Smith in Opposition of Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum to EPMI, a Bayside Company filed byAddie Smith. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Continuance and Request for Sanctions filed by Addie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Addie Smith re #8 MOTION in Opposition, #7 MOTION to Quash. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2022: #1 Envelope) (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION IN OPPOSITION to Notice of Pendency of Related Action. MOTION for Sanctions. Filed by Addie Smith. Responses due by 2/28/2022. Replies due by 3/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Quash filed by Addie Smith. Motion to Quash Petitioner's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum to EPMI, a Bayside Company. Responses due by 2/28/2022. Replies due by 3/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Paige Fletcher Petitioner/Def Legacy Partners (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Addie Smith, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Attorneys for EPMI)(Fletcher, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Partners Inc. re #1 MOTION for Hearing, 2 Case Assigned by Intake, #3 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Attorneys for EPMI (Mains, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Partners Inc. re #1 MOTION for Hearing, 2 Case Assigned by Intake, #3 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Addie Smith (Mains, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #1 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 2/16/2022. Replies due by 2/23/2022. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/7/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2022) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO COMPEL Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum against EPMI ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-16866897.). Filed by Legacy Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Kathryn Fletcher, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Proposed Order, #12 Certification of Interested Parties, #13 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #14 Notice of Pendency of Related Action, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 2/2/2022) Modified on 2/7/2022 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less