This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:18:11 (UTC).

Leftenant et al v. Blackmon et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Leftenant filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Blackmon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07846

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nathan Leftenant

Arnett Leftenant

Jeryl Bright

Gregory Johnson

Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins

Charles "Charlie&q Singleton

Eric Durham

Stephen moore

Gary Dow

Cheryl Cooper-Pratt

Damon Mendes

Defendants

Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Lawrence E Blackmon Services LLC

Atlanta Artist Records, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Lita Teresa Rosario

Attorney at Lita Rosario, PLLC

529 14Th St Nw, Suite 952

Washington, DC 20045

 

Court Documents

#9

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#20

(#20) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. UMG Recordings, Inc. served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. Service was accepted by Mara Velasco (Intake Specialist). Document filed by Jeryl Bright; Arnett Leftenant; Cheryl Cooper-Pratt; Eric Durham; Damon Mendes; Gregory Johnson; Nathan Leftenant; Charles "Charlie&q Singleton; Gary Dow; Stephen moore; Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#19

(#19) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Atlanta Artist Records, Inc served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Christy Reed, Customer Service Rep, for Georgia Corporation Division of Secretary of State's Office. Document filed by Jeryl Bright; Arnett Leftenant; Cheryl Cooper-Pratt; Eric Durham; Damon Mendes; Gregory Johnson; Nathan Leftenant; Charles "Charlie&q Singleton; Gary Dow; Stephen moore; Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#18

(#18) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UMG Recordings, Inc...(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#17

(#17) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atlanta Artist Records, Inc..(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#16

(#16) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon..(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#15

(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence E Blackmon Services LLC..(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#14

(#14) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lawrence E. Blackmon Services, LLC, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#13

(#13) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#12

(#12) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Atlanta Artist Records, Inc, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#11

(#11) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UMG Recordings, Inc, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Termination

10 #10

Main Document

#8

No Description Available

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. UMG Recordings, Inc. served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. Service was accepted by Mara Velasco (Intake Specialist). Document filed by Jeryl Bright; Arnett Leftenant; Cheryl Cooper-Pratt; Eric Durham; Damon Mendes; Gregory Johnson; Nathan Leftenant; Charles "Charlie&q Singleton; Gary Dow; Stephen moore; Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Atlanta Artist Records, Inc served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Christy Reed, Customer Service Rep, for Georgia Corporation Division of Secretary of State's Office. Document filed by Jeryl Bright; Arnett Leftenant; Cheryl Cooper-Pratt; Eric Durham; Damon Mendes; Gregory Johnson; Nathan Leftenant; Charles "Charlie&q Singleton; Gary Dow; Stephen moore; Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UMG Recordings, Inc...(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atlanta Artist Records, Inc..(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon..(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence E Blackmon Services LLC..(gp) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lawrence E. Blackmon Services, LLC, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Atlanta Artist Records, Inc, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UMG Recordings, Inc, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeryl Bright, Cheryl Cooper-Pratt, Gary Dow, Eric Durham, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins, Gregory Johnson, Arnett Leftenant, Nathan Leftenant, Damon Mendes, Charles Singleton, Stephen moore..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lita Teresa Rosario. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Lita Teresa Rosario to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lita Teresa Rosario. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon, UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25086468)Document filed by Nathan Leftenant, Gregory Johnson, Jeryl Bright, Arnett Leftenant, Thomas "Tomi" Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Rec and Notice of Termination).(Rosario, Lita) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lita Teresa Rosario