This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 22:34:32 (UTC).

Left Field Holdings et al v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On March 08, 2022, Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, and Left Field Holdings VI (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Alex J. Dravillas and Seth Adam Meyer of Keller Lenkner LLC; Bonny E. Sweeney and Michael Paul Lehmann of Hausfeld LLP; Bruce Samuel Sperling, Eamon Padraic Kelly, Joseph M. Vanek, and Timothy Sperling of Sperling & Slater. P.C., and Jason Allen Zweig, filed an intellectual lawsuit against Google LLC (“Defendant” or “Google”), seeking monetary relief and damages along with pre- and post-judgment interest for the alleged indirect infringement of the United States trademark owned by the plaintiffs. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with Judge Vince Chhabria presiding.

The plaintiffs filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of a U.S. trademark named “Lime Fresh” owned by the plaintiffs.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs alleged, “As mentioned previously, beginning in 2019, Google began placing a large blue button entitled: ‘Order Online’ within the Restaurant Information Box, directly underneath the restaurant’s tradename. Google has also labeled its deceptively placed button, ‘Order Delivery,’ and/or ‘Order Pickup.’ Plaintiffs will ascertain the various buttons used by Google to direct users into its deceptively branded websites upon discovery.”

Plaintiffs further alleged, “Google’s own advertising practices further confirm that Google knew its ‘Order Online’ button and linked webpages were likely to cause consumer confusion. As mentioned previously, Google’s usual practice is to label advertisements placed within its SERP as advertisements (by placing an ‘Ad’ label besides each advertisement). See, e.g., Figure 2, above. But its ‘Order Online’ button is not given such label.”

The plaintiffs claimed that “Google also derives significant sales and profits from its illegal Storefront by forcing consumers to pay for their purchases within the Storefront using Google’s ‘Google Pay’ service (herein referred to ‘GPay’) upon checking-out.”

Plaintiffs presented one claim for relief, including the alleged violation of Section 43(a) of the Lanham Act.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested that the action be maintained as a class action pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The plaintiffs also requested monetary, injunctive, and equitable relief with pre- and post-judgment interests, as well as costs and attorneys’ fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01462

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Left Field Holdings

Left Field Holdings II

Left Field Holdings III

Left Field Holdings IV

Left Field Holdings V

Left Field Holdings VI

Everfresh Endeavors

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce J. Wecker

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

600 Montgomery St, Suite 3200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael Paul Lehmann

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 3200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alex J Dravillas

Attorney at Keller Postman LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60606

Bruce Samuel Sperling

Attorney at Sperling & Slater PC

55 W Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Eamon Padraic Kelly

Attorney at Sperling & Slater P.C.

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Irving Scher

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

33 Whitehall Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Jason Allen Zweig

Attorney at Keller Postman LLC

150 N Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60606

Joseph M Vanek

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, P.C.

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Seth Adam Meyer

Attorney at Keller Postman LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60606

Timothy Sperling

Attorney at Sperling & Slater,P.C.

55 W. Monroe Street, Ste 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Trevor K. Scheetz

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, P.C.

55 West Monroe Street, Ste 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Berkowitz

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cody Shawn Harris

Attorney at Keker and Van Nest LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Kristin Elizabeth Hucek

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest and Peters LLP

833 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Luke P. Apfeld

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest and Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michelle Sabrina Ybarra

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

 

Court Documents

#65

RESTRICTED

#64

(#64) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #44 Motion to Dismiss. If an amended complaint is filed, a Case Management Statement is due by 2/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2023 01:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#63

(#63) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2022 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Google LLC, for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 11/14/2022) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#62

(#62) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2022 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI, for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2022) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#61

(#61) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting AS MODIFIED #60 Stipulation continuing case management conference. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2022) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

60 #1

Declaration of Kristin Hucek

60 #60

Main Document

44 #1

Proposed Order

44 #44

Main Document

#6

(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16972349.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Sperling, Bruce) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16972328.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16972273.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Vanek, Joseph) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16971121.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Dravillas, Alex) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16971075.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

68 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on October 27, 2022, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Transcribed by Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #62 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2023. (Related documents(s) #62 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2022) (Entered: 11/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #44 Motion to Dismiss. If an amended complaint is filed, a Case Management Statement is due by 2/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2023 01:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2022 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Google LLC, for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 11/14/2022) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2022 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI, for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2022) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting AS MODIFIED #60 Stipulation continuing case management conference. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2022) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Stipulation and Proposed Order to continue the initial Case Management Conference filed by Google LLC, Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI, Everfresh Endeavors.(Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristin Hucek)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/31/2022) Modified on 11/1/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 10/27/2022 re #44 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google LLC.The Court heard oral argument and took the matter under submission. A written ruling will be issued. Total Time in Court: 50 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 11:25 - 12:15. Plaintiff Attorney: Trevor Scheetz and Michael Lehmann. Defendant Attorney: Cody Harris and Kristin Hucek. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2022) Modified on 11/15/2022: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjd, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING THE TIME FOR THE MOTION HEARING ON 10/27/2022, RE #44 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2022, 11:00 AM, via Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-on ly entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/9/2022) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16973151.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Meyer, Seth) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16972367.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Sperling, Timothy) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16972349.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Sperling, Bruce) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16972328.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16972273.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Vanek, Joseph) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Civil Cover sheet Incomplete- Venue on Civil cover sheet was not marked.Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V , Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings VI (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16971121.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Dravillas, Alex) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16971075.) filed by Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings V, Left Field Holdings VI. (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NO PROCESS - COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-16970759.). Filed by Left Field Holdings VI, Left Field Holdings IV, Left Field Holdings, Left Field Holdings III, Left Field Holdings II, Left Field Holdings V. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/8/2022) Modified on 3/8/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/8/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Left Field Holdings is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin E. Hucek